Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2874550

EP2874550 - PATIENT-SPECIFIC INSTRUMENTATION FOR IMPLANT REVISION SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orthosoft, Inc.
75 Queen Street Suite 3300
Montreal, Québec H3C 2N6 / CA
[2015/22]
Inventor(s)01 / ABIVEN, Jean-Guillaume
352 Sainte-Madeleine
Montréal, Québec H3K 2K7 / CA
 [2015/22]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/39]
Former [2015/22]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13822636.023.07.2013
[2017/39]
WO2013CA50572
Priority number, dateUS201261674529P23.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261674529 P
[2015/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014015432
Date:30.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2874550
Date:27.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014
[2015/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2874550
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA30.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/56, A61B17/17, A61B6/00, A61B6/03, A61B17/15, A61B34/10, A61F2/28, A61F2/46
[2016/11]
Former International [2015/22]A61B17/56
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHES INSTRUMENTARIUM FÜR IMPLANTATREVISION[2017/15]
English:PATIENT-SPECIFIC INSTRUMENTATION FOR IMPLANT REVISION SURGERY[2015/22]
French:INSTRUMENTS SPÉCIFIQUES AU PATIENT POUR UNE CHIRURGIE DE RÉVISION D'IMPLANT[2015/22]
Former [2015/22]PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHES INSTRUMENTARIUM FÜR IMPLANTATNACHOPERATION
Entry into regional phase23.02.2015National basic fee paid 
23.02.2015Search fee paid 
23.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
14.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2017Fee for grant paid
16.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2017
Opposition(s)28.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201503   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/10]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011295378  (BOJARSKI RAYMOND A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0234] , [0254] , [0543] , [0837] , [0839] , [ 307] , [ 330] , [ 873] , [0257] , [0336] , [0875] , [0618]; figure 180 * * paragraphs [0453] , [0455] , [0456] *
International search[X]US2011295378  (BOJARSKI, R. ET AL.);
 [A]WO2010099353  (BOJARSKI, R. ET AL.);
 [A]US2009131941  (PARK, I. ET AL.);
 [A]US5897559  (MASINI, M.)