blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2877115

EP2877115 - PATIENT SPECIFIC INSTRUMENTATION WITH MEMS IN SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.05.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.06.2022  [2022/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orthosoft ULC
75 Queen Street Suite 3300
Montréal, QC H3C 2N6 / CA
For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/51]For all designated states
Orthosoft ULC
75 Queen Street Suite 3300
Montréal QC H3C 2N6 / CA
For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
Former [2015/23]For all designated states
Orthosoft Inc.
75 Queen Street
Suite 3300
Montréal
Québec H3C 2N6 / CA
For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MCCAULEY, Jeffrey A.
c/o Zimmer Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
02 / AMIOT, Louis-Philippe
49 rue Thurlow
Hampstead, Québec H3X 3G8 / CA
 [2015/23]
Representative(s)Taor, Simon Edward William
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/23]Mays, Julie, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13823276.424.07.2013
WO2013CA50574
Priority number, dateUS201261675242P24.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261675242 P
[2015/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014015433
Date:30.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2877115
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA30.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61B34/10
[2016/19]
CPC:
A61B5/6878 (EP,US); A61B5/06 (US); A61B17/15 (US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US); A61B5/1114 (EP,US); G16H50/50 (EP,US);
A61B2034/102 (EP,US); A61B2034/105 (EP,US); A61B2034/108 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2048 (EP,US); A61B2505/05 (EP,US); A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/505 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2015/23]A61B19/00, A61B17/15, A61B17/17, A61B5/00, A61B6/00, B81B7/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
TitleGerman:PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHES INSTRUMENT MIT MEMS IN DER CHIRURGIE[2015/23]
English:PATIENT SPECIFIC INSTRUMENTATION WITH MEMS IN SURGERY[2015/23]
French:INSTRUMENT SPÉCIFIQUE D'UN PATIENT ET DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME MICROÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE À UTILISER EN CHIRURGIE[2015/23]
Entry into regional phase24.02.2015National basic fee paid 
24.02.2015Search fee paid 
24.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
07.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/26]
22.02.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2022/26]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202109   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2010121147  (CONFORMIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0087]; figure 4 *;
 [X]US2011275957  (BHANDARI SACHIN [US]) [X] 9-13 * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104]; figures 3f, 3a * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0127] *;
 [X]WO2012027816  (ORTOSOFT INC [CA], et al) [X] 9-13 * page 19 - page 21 ** page 7 - page 10 *
International search[Y]US2010076563  (OTTO JASON KARL [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010082035  (KEEFER RYAN [US]);
 [Y]US2012157887  (FANSON RICHARD TYLER [CA], et al)
by applicantUS2009247863
 US2009248044
 WO2010121147
 US2011275957
 US20100846934
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.