Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2939691

EP2939691 - DENGUE VIRUS VACCINE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.08.2019 [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Centro De Ingeniería Genética Y Biotecnología
Avenida 31 entre 158 y 190.
Cubanacán, Playa
11600 La Habana / CU
[2019/08]
Former [2015/45]For all designated states
Centro De Ingeniería Genética Y Biotecnología
Anenida 31 entre 158 y 190.
Cubanacán, Playa
11600 La Habana / CU
Inventor(s)01 / HERMIDA CRUZ, Lisset
Calle 172 No. 4317
entre 43 y 45
Versalles
La Lisa
17100 La Habana / CU
02 / GIL GONZÁLEZ, Lázaro
Avenida 17 No. 1815
entre 18 y 20
Nueva Paz
33100 Mayabeque / CU
03 / IZQUIERDO OLIVA, Alienys
68 No. 6709
entre 57 y 59
Guanajay
32200 Artemisa / CU
04 / MARCOS LÓPEZ, Ernesto
Calle 122A No. 2542
entre 25 y 27
Marianao
11500 La Habana / CU
05 / SUZARTE PORTAL, Edith
Duany No. 3 entre Calzada de Managua y Rosell
Mantilla
Arroyo Naranjo
10900 La Habana / CU
06 / GUILLÉN NIETO, Gerardo, Enrique
Línea No. 6 entre N y O
piso 4
Vedado
Plaza de la Revolución
10400 La Habana / CU
07 / GUZMÁN TIRADO, María, Guadalupe
Calle 28
No. 116
entre 1era y 3ra
Miramar, Playa
11300 La Habana / CU
08 / VALDÉS PRADO, Iris
Santa Felicia No. 427
entre Melones y Rosa Enríquez
Luyanó
10 de Octubre
10700 La Habana / CU
09 / LAZO VAZQUEZ, Laura
Arellano No. 274
apto 2
entre C y Altarriba
Lawton, 10 de Octubre
10700 La Habana / CU
10 / GARCÍA ARECHAVALETA, Angélica, de la Caridad
Calle 5ta
Edif. 107
Apto. 2
entre G y H, Plaza
10400 La Habana / CU
11 / ALVAREZ VERA, Mayling
Teresa Blanco No. 322 altos
entre Fonts y Bouza
Luyanó
10 de Octubre
10500 La Habana / CU
12 / CASTRO VELAZCO, Jorge
Calle 186 No. 3117
entre 31 y 33
Apto 7I
Playa
11600 La Habana / CU
13 / LÓPEZ FERNÁNDEZ, Lázaro
Ave 29 No. 3010
entre 30 y 32
San Antonio de los Baños
32500 Artemisa / CU
14 / RAMÍREZ BARTUTIS, Rosa, Liset
Calle 6ta No. 181
Apto 1
entre Fomento y Lindero
Palatino, Cerro
10600 La Habana / CU
15 / PÉREZ FUENTES, Yusleidi, de la Caridad
Calle La Sola
No. 117 interior
entre Luis Estévez y Estrada Palma
10 de Octubre
10700 La Habana / CU
16 / PÉREZ, GUEVARA, Olga, Lidia
San Miguel No. 506
entre Mayía Rodríguez y Anita
Víbora
10 de Octubre
10500 La Habana / CU
17 / ROMERO FERNÁNDEZ, Yaremy
Calle 230
Edif 161
Apto 23
entre 49 y 51, San Agustín, La Lisa
17100 La Habana / CU
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/08]
Former [2015/45]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13823919.916.12.2013
[2015/45]
WO2013CU00008
Priority number, dateCU2012000017927.12.2012         Original published format: CU 20120179
[2015/45]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014101903
Date:03.07.2014
Language:ES
[2014/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2939691
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2939691
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/12, C07K14/005
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Extension statesBA20.07.2015
ME20.07.2015
TitleGerman:VAKZINE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG GEGEN DENGUEVIRUS[2018/45]
English:DENGUE VIRUS VACCINE COMPOSITION[2015/45]
French:COMPOSITION VACCINALE CONTRE LE VIRUS DE LA DENGUE[2015/45]
Former [2015/45]DENGUE-VIRUS-IMPFSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG
Entry into regional phase20.07.2015Translation filed 
20.07.2015National basic fee paid 
20.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
15.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2019Fee for grant paid
08.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
[2019/33]
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2007031034  (CT INGENIERIA GENETICA BIOTECH [CU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * p. 9 lines 3-5 and 15-17 * p. 11 lines 10-17 * p. 15 lines 1-11;; claims 1, 2, 7; table 5; sequences 16, 18, 22 *;
 [YD]  - VALDES I ET AL, "A novel fusion protein domain III-capsid from dengue-2, in a highly aggregated form, induces a functional immune response and protection in mice", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 394, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.VIROL.2009.08.029, ISSN 0042-6822, (20091125), pages 249 - 258, (20090923), XP026753975 [YD] 1-15 * Abstract * Introduction (p.250) * p.251 "In vitro assembly process" * p.254 (par. spanning left and right col.) * Figs. 1, 6, 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2009.08.029
 [Y]  - LAURA LAZO ET AL, "A vaccine formulation consisting of nucleocapsid-like particles from Dengue-2 and the fusion protein P64k-domain III from Dengue-1 induces a protective immune response against the homologous serotypes in mice", ACTA TROPICA, (20121101), vol. 124, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.actatropica.2012.06.006, ISSN 0001-706X, pages 107 - 112, XP055065454 [Y] 1-15 * Abstract * Discussion (last par.) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actatropica.2012.06.006
 [AD]  - HOMBACH JOACHIM, "Vaccines against dengue: a review of current candidate vaccines at advanced development stages.", REVISTA PANAMERICANA DE SALUD PÚBLICA = PAN AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PUBLIC HEALTH APR 2007, (200704), vol. 21, no. 4, ISSN 1020-4989, pages 254 - 260, XP002722230 [AD] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1590/S1020-49892007000300011
 [AD]  - CLEMENTS D E ET AL, "Development of a recombinant tetravalent dengue virus vaccine: Immunogenicity and efficacy studies in mice and monkeys", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 28, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2010.01.022, ISSN 0264-410X, (20100324), pages 2705 - 2715, (20100308), XP026946252 [AD] 1-15 * page 2710 - paragraph 3.6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.01.022
 [AD]  - GUZMAN MARIA G ET AL, "Domain III of the envelope protein as a dengue vaccine target.", EXPERT REVIEW OF VACCINES FEB 2010, (201002), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 1744-8395, pages 137 - 147, XP009177106 [AD] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/erv.09.139
Examination   - CARLOS L PRG A<3>PEZ ET AL, "In vitro assembly of nucleocapsid-like particles from purified recombinant capsid protein of dengue-2 virus", ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY ; OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE VIROLOGY DIVISIONOF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF MICROBIOLOGICAL SOCIETIES, SPRINGER-VERLAG, VI, (20090321), vol. 154, no. 4, ISSN 1432-8798, pages 695 - 698, XP019722911
by applicant   - GUZMAN ET AL., LANCET INFECT.DIS., (2002), vol. 2, pages 33 - 42
    - LEYSSEN ET AL., CIN.MICROBIOL.REV., (2000), vol. 13, pages 67 - 82
    - MONGKOLSAPAYA ET AL., NAT.MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 921 - 927
    - BHAMARAPRAVATI ET AL., VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, pages 44 - 47
    - KANESA-THASAN ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 3179 - 3188
    - MORRISON ET AL., J.INFECT.DIS., (2010), vol. 201, pages 370 - 377
    - HOMBACH, REV.PANAM.SAIUD PUBLICA., (2007), vol. 21, pages 254 - 260
    - CLEMENTS ET AL., VACCINE, (2010), vol. 28, pages 2705 - 2715
    - GIL ET AL., VIRAL IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 22, pages 23 - 30
    - YAUCH ET AL., J.IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 182, pages 4865 - 4873
    - YAUCH ET AL., J.IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 185, pages 5405 - 5416
    - GUZMAN ET AL., EXP.REV.VACCINES, (2010), vol. 9, pages 137 - 147
    - KUHN ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 108, pages 717 - 725
    - GAGNON ET AL., J.VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 141 - 147
    - GAGNON ET AL., J.VIROI., (1999), vol. 73, pages 3623 - 3629
    - LAZO ET AL., VACCINE, (2007), vol. 25, pages 1 064 - 1 070
    - LOPEZ ET AL., ARCH.VIROL., (2009), vol. 154, pages 695 - 698
    - GIL ET AL., INTLMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 21, pages 1175 - 1183
    - CHEN ET AL., J.VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 8765 - 8772
    - CRILL ET AL., J.VIROL., (2001), vol. 75, pages 7769 - 7773
    - HERMIDA ET AL., J.VIROLMETHODS, (2004), vol. 115, pages 41 - 49
    - SIMMONS ET AL., AM.J.TROP.MED.HYG., (2001), vol. 65, pages 159 - 161
    - HERMIDA ET AL., VACCINE, (2006), vol. 24, pages 3165 - 3171
    - VALDES ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2009), vol. 394, pages 249 - 258
    - VALDES ET AL., CLIN.VACCINE IMMUNOL., (2011), vol. 18, pages 455 - 459
    - KLINMAN, INT.REV.LMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 25, pages 1 - 20
    - VOLLMER, INT.REV.LMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 25, pages 125 - 134
    - KRUG ET AL., EUR.J.LMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 31, pages 2154 - 2163
    - VERTHELYI ET AL., J.IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 166, pages 2372 - 2377
    - RIEDL ET AL., J.IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, pages 4951 - 4959