Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2946438

EP2946438 - AN IMPROVED PORTABLE ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.10.2015
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEONARDO MW LTD
Christopher Martin Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3EL / GB
[2016/51]
Former [2015/48]For all designated states
SELEX ES LTD
Christopher Martin Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3EL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PRYOR, Neil
c/o Selex ES Ltd
Building 20/A1
2 Southside
PO BOX 5, Off Southmead Road
Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB
02 / ATKINS, David
c/o Selex ES Ltd
Building 20/A1
2 Southside
PO BOX 5, Off Southmead Road
Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB
03 / HALL, David
c/o Selex ES Ltd
Building 20/A1
2 Southside
PO BOX 5, Off Southmead Road
Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB
 [2015/48]
Representative(s)Tolfree, Adam Joseph Benjamin
Leonardo MW Ltd
c/o Impetus IP Limited
Suite 31, West Devon Business Park
Brook Lane
Tavistock, Devon PL19 9DP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/48]Tolfree, Adam Joseph Benjamin
Suite 31, West Devon Business Park
Brook Lane
Tavistock, Devon PL19 9DP / GB
Application number, filing date13823943.909.12.2013
[2015/48]
WO2013EP75996
Priority number, dateGB2012002339624.12.2012         Original published format: GB 201223396
GB2012002339824.12.2012         Original published format: GB 201223398
GB2012002339924.12.2012         Original published format: GB 201223399
GB2012002340024.12.2012         Original published format: GB 201223400
[2015/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014102058
Date:03.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2946438
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/08, H01Q1/27, H01Q1/48, H01Q9/16, H01Q1/24, H01Q1/26, H01Q19/30, H01Q21/24, H01Q21/26
[2015/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/48]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE TRAGBARE ANTENNE[2015/48]
English:AN IMPROVED PORTABLE ANTENNA[2015/48]
French:ANTENNE PORTABLE AMÉLIORÉE[2015/48]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2015National basic fee paid 
22.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
13.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP0777296  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 54; figures 2-4 * [I] 14;
 [XI]EP0791878  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 12; figures 1-2 * [I] 14;
 [X]US2010171677  (RAKOTOARISOA BRUNO [FR]) [X] 1-4,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0051] - [0062]; figures 1-14 *;
 [X]JP2004304541  (WINTEL KK, et al) [X] 1-4,14 * abstract *;
 [A]US2012280869  (KIRKHAM JEFFREY B [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0040]; figures 1A-2E *