Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2928648

EP2928648 - ROBOT PROGRAM GENERATION FOR ROBOTIC PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Technology AG
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
[2015/42]
Inventor(s)01 / BOCA, Remus
56 Massaco St.
Simsbury, CT 06070 / US
02 / NIDAMARTHI, Srinivas
201 N. Squirrel Road
Apt. 703
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2015/42]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13824547.706.12.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013US73463
Priority number, dateUS201261735300P10.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261735300 P
[2015/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014093144
Date:19.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2928648
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014
[2015/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/16
[2015/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
TitleGerman:ROBOTERPROGRAMMERZEUGUNG FÜR ROBOTISCHE PROZESSE[2015/42]
English:ROBOT PROGRAM GENERATION FOR ROBOTIC PROCESSES[2015/42]
French:GÉNÉRATION DE PROGRAMME DE ROBOT POUR PROCESSUS ROBOTIQUES[2015/42]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2015National basic fee paid 
11.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
26.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1712294  (ABB SERVICE SRL [IT]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0040] * [I] 2,7-15;
 [XI]WO2010091086  (FANUC ROBOTICS AMERICA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,7-15;
 [A]EP2468463  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,7-11,15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0054] *
 [I]  - SUH S-H ET AL, "PROTOTYPE INTEGRATED ROBOTIC PAINTING SYSTEM: SOFTWARE AND HARDWARE DEVELOPMENT", JOURNAL OF MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS, SOCIETY OF MANUFACTURING ENGINEERS, DEARBORN, MI, US, (19930101), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 0278-6125, pages 463 - 473, XP000448773 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *