EP2881379 - OXIDE SINTERED BODY AND TABLET OBTAINED BY PROCESSING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Mining Co., Ltd. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Tokuyuki c/o Ichikawa Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 3-18-5 Nakakokubun Ichikawa-shi Chiba 272-8588 / JP | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/24] | Application number, filing date | 13824771.3 | 31.07.2013 | WO2013JP70728 | Priority number, date | JP20120170148 | 31.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012170148 | [2015/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014021374 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881379 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/00, C23C14/24 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
C23C14/08 (EP,US);
C04B35/457 (KR);
H01B1/08 (US);
C04B35/01 (EP,US);
C04B35/6261 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (KR);
C23C14/086 (EP,US);
C23C14/32 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3256 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3258 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3286 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3293 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6586 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | OXIDSINTERKÖRPER UND DURCH DESSEN VERARBEITUNG HERGESTELLTE TABLETTE | [2015/24] | English: | OXIDE SINTERED BODY AND TABLET OBTAINED BY PROCESSING SAME | [2015/24] | French: | CORPS FRITTÉ D'OXYDE ET COMPRIMÉ OBTENU PAR LE TRAITEMENT DUDIT CORPS | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2014 | Translation filed | 18.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 30.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 24.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH0849070 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 1,3,5-9 * abstract and examples, tables - paragraph 0052 * [I] 2,4; | [A]EP1961715 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * example 2 *; | [A]JP2008214169 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 1-9 * abstract and examples - in particular example 4 *; | [A]WO2011061916 (ULVAC INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* examples, table 1, figure 1 *; | [A]EP2463400 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * examples - particular example 15 *; | [A]EP2463255 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * comparative example 5; * | International search | [Y]JPH04160047 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [Y]JPH07145478 (DOWA MINING CO); | [A]JP2007056351 (HAKUSUI TECH CO LTD, et al); | [X]WO2007069415 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008260660 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [Y]WO2011016387 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2011080116 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO); | [Y]WO2011118334 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH08232060 | JPH11100660 | JP2007194447 | JP2011202246 | - Tomei dodenmaku no gijyutsu (Technique for transparent conductive films), 2nd edition, OHMSHA, LTD., (20061220), pages 243 - 250 |