Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2880914

EP2880914 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADJUSTING MOBILITY PARAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.05.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / WON, Sunghwan
No. 205
399-8 Maetan 3-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-373 / KR
02 / KIM, Sangbum
No. 129-203 Weve Haneulchae Apt.
Maetan 3-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-373 / KR
03 / BAE, Beomsik
No. 1001-1803
BangJuk Maeul Yeongtong Tranchae Apt.
Mangpo-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-400 / KR
04 / LIM, Hanna
No. 103-101
Oksu Gangbyeon Poongrim I-won Apt.
Oksu-dong
Seongdong-gu
Seoul 133-100 / KR
05 / JEONG, Sangsoo
No. 503
2-4 Maesanno 2-ga
Paldal-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-082 / KR
06 / CHO, Songyean
No. 103-1704 Gyeongnam Gyosu Apt.
Sindaebang 1-dong
Dongjak-gu
Seoul 156-011 / KR
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13825765.402.08.2013
WO2013KR06989
Priority number, dateKR2012008524503.08.2012         Original published format: KR 20120085245
KR2013001025830.01.2013         Original published format: KR 20130010258
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014021676
Date:06.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2880914
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/38
[2015/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG VON MOBILITÄTSPARAMETERN[2015/24]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADJUSTING MOBILITY PARAMETER[2015/24]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AJUSTEMENT DE PARAMÈTRE DE MOBILITÉ[2015/24]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2015National basic fee paid 
21.01.2015Search fee paid 
21.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
01.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010173626  (CATOVIC AMER [US] ET AL) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0088]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0110]; figure 9 *;
 [X]US2012069732  (XU LIXIANG [CN] ET AL) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0051]; figure 4A *;
 [X]WO2010057125  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; AGASHE PARAG A [US]; TENNY NATHAN E [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036]; figure 2 *;
 [X]EP2302968  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0088]; figure 3 *;
 [X]  - Chris Johnson, "32.9 MOBILITY ROBUSTNESS OPTIMISATION", Long Term Evolution IN BULLETS, 2nd edition, CreateSpace Independent Publishing Platform, (20120706), ISBN 978-1-4781-6617-7, XP055278963 [X] 1-12 * figure 321 *
International search[A]US2011105074  (WU CHIH-HSIANG);
 [A]WO2011099745  (LG ELECTRONICS INC. ET AL.);
 [A]US2011250880  (OLSSON ANDREAS);
 [A]WO2011127444  (QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ET AL.)