EP2880444 - SELECTIVE CAPTURE AND STIMULATED RELEASE OF CIRCULATING CELLS ON NANOSTRUCTURED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states Riken 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSENG, Hsian-Rong 1932 Selby Avenue Apartment 101 Los Angeles California 90025 / US | 02 /
HOU, Shuang 3633 Kelton Ave. Apt. 1 Los Angeles, CA 90095 / US | 03 /
ZHAO, Libo 3210 Sawtelle Boulevard 109 Los Angeles California 90066 / US | 04 /
YU, Hsiao-Hua 2-1 Hirosawa Wako Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 05 /
LUO, Shyh-Chyang 2-1 Hirosawa Wako Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 06 /
ZHAO, Haichao 2-1 Hirosawa Wako Saitama 351-0198 / JP | [2016/19] |
Former [2015/24] | 01 /
TSENG, Hsian-Rong 1932 Selby Avenue Apartment 101 Los Angeles California 90025 / US | ||
02 /
HOU, Shuang 3155 S. Sepulveda Boulevard 308 Los Angeles California 90034 / US | |||
03 /
ZHAO, Libo 3210 Sawtelle Boulevard 109 Los Angeles California 90066 / US | |||
04 /
YU, Hsiao-Hua 2-1 Hirosawa Wako Saitama 351-0198 / JP | |||
05 /
LUO, Shyh-Chyang 2-1 Hirosawa Wako Saitama 351-0198 / JP | |||
06 /
ZHAO, Haichao 2-1 Hirosawa Wako Saitama 351-0198 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13825840.5 | 31.07.2013 | WO2013US53063 | Priority number, date | US201261677825P | 31.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261677825 P | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014022581 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2880444 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/563, G01N33/48, C12Q1/04, G01N33/543 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/54306 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/545 (US);
G01N33/54346 (US);
G01N2333/70596 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | G01N33/53, G01N33/563, G01N33/48, C12Q1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE ERFASSUNG UND STIMULIERTE FREISETZUNG VON ZIRKULIERENDEN ZELLEN AUF NANOSTRUKTURIERTEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2015/24] | English: | SELECTIVE CAPTURE AND STIMULATED RELEASE OF CIRCULATING CELLS ON NANOSTRUCTURED DEVICES | [2015/24] | French: | CAPTURE SÉLECTIVE ET LIBÉRATION STIMULÉE DE CELLULES CIRCULANTES SUR DES DISPOSITIFS NANOSTRUCTURÉS | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 22.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9627132 (IMMUNIVEST CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15* page 5, line 14 - line 27 *; | [Y]WO2010108003 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim - *; | [Y] - JUNGWOOK KIM ET AL, "Mimicking dynamicenvironments with stimuli-responsive materials for cell culture", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 30, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.TIBTECH.2012.04.003, ISSN 0167-7799, (20120602), pages 426 - 439, (20120423), XP028427708 [Y] 1-15 * page 435, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2012.04.003 | [Y] - COLE M A ET AL, "Stimuli-responsive interfaces and systems for the control of protein-surface and cell-surface interactions", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 30, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2008.12.026, ISSN 0142-9612, (20090301), pages 1827 - 1850, (20090113), XP025928051 [Y] 1-15 * Introduction; page 1827 * * page 1846, paragraph 3 * * figures 3, 9, 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2008.12.026 | International search | [A] - LI ET AL., "Fabrication of thermoresponsive polymer gradients for study of cell adhesion and detachment", LANGMUIR, (2008), vol. 24, no. 23, pages 13632 - 13639, XP055191432 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la802556e | [A] - COLE ET AL., "Stimuli-responsive interfaces and systems for the control of protein-surface and cell-surface interactions", BIOMATERIALS, (2009), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 1827 - 1850, XP025928051 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2008.12.026 | [A] - BRUN-GRAEPPI ET AL., "Thermoresponsive surfaces for cell culture and enzyme-free cell detachment", PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 35, no. 11, pages 1311 - 1324, XP027434966 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2010.07.007 | [A] - ZHOU ET AL., "A temperature-responsive antibody-like nanostructure", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2010), vol. 8, no. 11, pages 2087 - 2093, XP055191436 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm100450k | [A] - KIM ET AL., "Mimicking dynamic in vivo environments with stimuli-responsive materials for cell culture", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20120602), vol. 30, no. 8, pages 426 - 439, XP028427708 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2012.04.003 | [XP] - HOU ET AL., "Capture and stimulated release of circulating tumor cells on polymer-grafted silicon nanostructures", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (20121217), vol. 25, no. 11, pages 1547 - 1551, XP008176461 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201203185 |