Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2880802

EP2880802 - MULTIPLEXING OF CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION AND HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST - ACKNOWLEDGEMENT INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / HAN, Seunghee
203-901, Hogye 2nd Hyundai Hometown
Hogye 3-dong, Dongan-gu
Anyangshi, Kyoungkido 431-764 / KR
02 / HE, Hong
8F, Raycom Infotech Park A
2 KeXueYuan South Road
HaiDian District, Beijing 100190 / CN
03 / FWU, Jong-Kae
1519 Dminion Ave.
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
04 / BASHAR, Shafi
4450 Basset St., Apt. 3
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
05 / CHATTERJEE, Debdeep
2353 Pruneridge Ave., Apt. 12
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
06 / HEO, Youn Hyoung
4F, 27-3, Hana Daetoo Securities Bldg.
Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul, 150-705 / US
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2018/13]
Former [2015/24]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13825921.305.08.2013
[2018/13]
WO2013US53659
Priority number, dateUS201261679627P03.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261679627 P
US20131393409502.07.2013         Original published format: US201313934095
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014022861
Date:06.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2880802
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2880802
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04
[2016/11]
Former International [2015/24]H04L1/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MULTIPLEXIERUNG VON KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONEN UND QUITTIERUNGSINFORMATIONEN FÜR HYBRIDE AUTOMATISCHE WIEDERHOLUNGSANFORDERUNGEN[2015/24]
English:MULTIPLEXING OF CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION AND HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST - ACKNOWLEDGEMENT INFORMATION[2015/24]
French:MULTIPLEXAGE D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL ET D'INFORMATIONS D'ACCUSÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE REQUÊTE AUTOMATIQUE DE RÉPÉTITION HYBRIDE[2015/24]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2015National basic fee paid 
23.01.2015Search fee paid 
23.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
14.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2018Fee for grant paid
16.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18151568.5  / EP3328142
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.11.2017
Opposition(s)03.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
LU05.08.2018
MT05.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/26]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
LU05.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
LU05.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
Former [2018/49]AL28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
Former [2018/41]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
Former [2018/35]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
NO28.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011157098  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 6,7 * the whole document * [I] 8-11;
 [XPI]EP2582082  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [XP] 6,7 * paragraphs [0092] , [0109] , [0154] - [0157] - [0269] - [0284] * [I] 8-11;
 [XA]WO2012057571  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 14 * the whole document * [A] 15;
 [XPA]US2013044653  (YANG SUCKCHEL [KR], et al) [XP] 14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0077] - [0080] * [A] 15
 [XI]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "On reducing periodic CSI dropping for CA operation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122762 ON REDUCING PERIODIC CSI DROPPING FOR CA OPERATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050600941 [X] 1,5 * Chapter 2.1 * [I] 2-4
 [AD]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120626), vol. RAN WG1, no. V10.6.0, pages 1 - 125, XP050580749 [AD] 1-5 * Chapter 10. *
 [A]  - ZTE, "Remaining Issues of UL Channel Combinations for Rel-10", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110808, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110215), vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20110221, XP050490596 [A] 12,13 * the whole document *
International search[A]WO2010149069  (ZTE CORP [CN], et al);
 [A]EP2385647  (HTC CORP [TW]);
 [A]US2009201869  (XU HAO [US], et al);
 [A]KR20110088393  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]US2010271970  (PAN KYLE JUNG-LIN [US], et al)