Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2881615

EP2881615 - VIBRATION DAMPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOJIMA Hiroshi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
YOKOHAMA PLANT
1 Kashio-cho
Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8510 / JP
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date13826012.017.07.2013
WO2013JP69438
Priority number, dateJP2012017318403.08.2012         Original published format: JP 2012173184
[2015/24]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014021108
Date:06.02.2014
Language:JA
[2014/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2881615
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16F13/10, F16F13/14, F16F13/18
[2016/20]
Former International [2015/24]F16F13/06, F16F13/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
TitleGerman:SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2015/24]
English:VIBRATION DAMPING DEVICE[2015/24]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEMENT DE VIBRATIONS[2015/24]
Entry into regional phase03.02.2015Translation filed 
03.02.2015National basic fee paid 
03.02.2015Search fee paid 
03.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
03.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0300090  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 7, line 10 - line 17 * * column 7, line 26 - line 30 * [I] 6,7;
 [XI]EP0248714  (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 11, line 27 - line 33 * [I] 6,7;
 [XA]JPS60168931  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3,6;
 [A]DE10024535  (TRELLEBORG AUTOMOTIVE TECH CT [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0503654  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH0893838  (BRIDGESTONE CORP.);
 [Y]JPS6361533B  (BRIDGESTONE CORP.);
 [Y]JPH0622641U  (NOK MEGULASTIK CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPH0372135U  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPH0914334  (BRIDGESTONE CORP.);
 [A]JPH07158687  (BRIDGESTONE CORP.)
by applicantJP2002327788