Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2881615 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2881615



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 359
04.10.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.10.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.10.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.10.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 57
04.10.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 57
05.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
05.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.04.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
05.04.2019 Description Search / examination 2
05.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.04.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.04.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
25.03.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
25.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
25.03.2019 Description Search / examination 2
25.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.03.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.12.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.12.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.06.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.03.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.11.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
03.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
03.11.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
03.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
03.11.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
03.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.05.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 4
18.04.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
06.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
16.02.2015 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
03.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.02.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.02.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
03.02.2015 Description Search / examination 42
03.02.2015 Drawings Search / examination 10
03.02.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.12.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
25.02.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
06.02.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.02.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
06.02.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 41