Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2881615


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.10.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.03.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.12.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.12.2018 First examination report
31.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.11.2016 Amendment by applicant
26.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2016 Change - classification published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
15.04.2016 Change - classification published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
15.04.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
09.10.2015 Change - extension states published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
14.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.05.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
08.05.2015 Request for examination filed published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
05.03.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
12.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2015 Change - representative
04.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication