Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2881615 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380040878 EP13826012



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9366308Global Dossier 14.06.2016B2
US2015184717 02.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP69438 17.07.2013
JP2012173184 03.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104508318BGlobal Dossier 30.03.2016B
CN104508318 08.04.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013JP69438 17.07.2013
JP2012173184 03.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2881615Global Dossier 18.05.2016A4
EP2881615 10.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP69438 17.07.2013
JP2012173184 03.08.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014021108Global Dossier 06.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012173184 03.08.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5919129BGlobal Dossier 18.05.2016B2
JP2014031843 20.02.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2012173184 03.08.2012