Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2880902

EP2880902 - COMMUNICATION PATH SWITCHING FOR MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / STOJANOVSKI, Alexandre S.
6 Villa Faucheur
75020 Paris / FR
02 / KOWALEWSKI, Frank
Muenchhausenstrasse 28
37085 Goettingen / DE
03 / VENKATACHALAM, Muthaiah
16620 NW Paddington Drive
Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2018/16]
Former [2015/24]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13826189.624.06.2013
[2018/16]
WO2013US47262
Priority number, dateUS201261679627P03.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261679627 P
US20121370962810.12.2012         Original published format: US201213709628
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014022016
Date:06.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2880902
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2880902
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/10, H04W80/10
[2015/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSPFADUMSCHALTUNG FÜR MOBILE VORRICHTUNGEN[2015/24]
English:COMMUNICATION PATH SWITCHING FOR MOBILE DEVICES[2015/24]
French:COMMUTATION DE TRAJET DE COMMUNICATION POUR DES DISPOSITIFS MOBILES[2015/24]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2015National basic fee paid 
23.01.2015Search fee paid 
23.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
11.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2018Fee for grant paid
12.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2017
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
LU24.06.2018
MT24.06.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/26]AL18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
LU24.06.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AL18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
LU24.06.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP1976228  (INTEL CORP [US]) [I] 1-4,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0039] * [Y] 5-11;
 [YA]US2011294474  (BARANY PETER ANTHONY [US], et al) [Y] 5-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0081] - [0102] * [A] 1-4,12-14
International search[X]US2007299927  (KNAUERHASE ROBERT C [US]);
 [A]US2011040888  (KRISHNASWAMY DILIP [US], et al);
 [A]KR20090006504  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]US2012179829  (GEORGE RICHARD JOHN [CA]);
 [A]US2010318668  (SYLVAIN DANY [CA])
by applicantEP1976228
 US2011294474