Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2935361

EP2935361 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF (CO) POLYMERS OF CONJUGATED DIENES IN THE PRESENCE OF A CATALYTIC SYSTEM COMPRISING A BIS-IMINE COMPLEX OF COBALT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Versalis S.p.A.
Piazza Boldrini 1
20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / RICCI, Giovanni
Via E. Sartori 11/1
I-43126 Parma / IT
02 / SOMMAZZI, Anna
Piazza Mazzini 10
I-16038 Santa Margherita Genova / IT
03 / LEONE, Giuseppe
Via C. Saldini 38
I-20133 Milano / IT
04 / MASI, Francesco
Via Galvani 7
I-26866 Sant' Angelo Lodigiano / IT
05 / BOGLIA, Aldo
Via Dante 1
I-20026 Novate Milanese (Milano) / IT
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Mauro, Marina Eliana
Murgitroyd & Company
Piazza Borromeo, 12
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13826966.719.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013IB61125
Priority number, dateIT2012MI0219920.12.2012         Original published format: IT MI20122199
[2015/44]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014097199
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2935361
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2935361
Date:07.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08F36/06, C08F136/06
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON (CO)POLYMEREN VON KONJUGIERTEN DIEN-MONOMEREN IN ANWESENHEIT EINES KATALYTISCHEN SYSTEMS, BEINHALTEND EINEN BIS-IMINO-KOBALTKOMPLEX[2016/49]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF (CO) POLYMERS OF CONJUGATED DIENES IN THE PRESENCE OF A CATALYTIC SYSTEM COMPRISING A BIS-IMINE COMPLEX OF COBALT[2015/44]
French:PROCESSUS DE PRÉPARATION DE (CO)POLYMÈRES DE DIÈNE CONJUGUÉS EN PRÉSENCE D'UN SYSTÈME CATALYTIQUE COMPRENANT UN COMPLEXE DE COBALT AYANT UNE LIAISON BIS-IMINO[2016/49]
Former [2015/44]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON (CO)POLYMEREN AUS KONJUGIERTEN DIENEN IN GEGENWART EINES KATALYTISCHEN SYSTEMS MIT EINEM BIS-IMIN-KOBALTKOMPLEX
Former [2015/44]PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE (CO) POLYMÈRES DE DIÈNES CONJUGUÉS EN PRÉSENCE D'UN SYSTÈME CATALYTIQUE COMPRENANT UN COMPLEXE BIS-IMINE DE COBALT
Entry into regional phase15.07.2015National basic fee paid 
15.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
22.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2016Fee for grant paid
23.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2016
Opposition(s)08.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
MK07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
MT19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/32]CY07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
MK07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/51]DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/49]EE07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/43]EE07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/28]HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV07.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2011086580  (RELIANCE IND LTD [IN], et al) [X] 18 * example 3 *;
 [A]DE10038214  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1367069  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [[0042]] *
 [X]  - SUYUN JIE ET AL, "Highly active and stereospecific polymerization of 1,3-butadiene catalyzed by dinuclear cobalt(ii) complexes bearing 3-aryliminomethyl-2-hydroxybenzaldehydes", DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (2011), vol. 40, no. 41, doi:10.1039/c1dt11073j, ISSN 1477-9226, page 10975, XP055061366 [X] 18 * table 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1dt11073j
 [X]  - KIM BU UNG ET AL, "Highly cis-selectivity and low molecular weight distribution polymerization of 1,3-butadiene with cobalt (II) pyridyl bis(imine) complexes in the presence of ethylaluminum sesquichloride: effect of methyl position in the ligand", STUDIES IN SURFACE SCIENCE AND CATALYSIS, ELSEVIER B.V, (2006), vol. 159, ISSN 0167-2991, pages 873 - 876, XP009169226 [X] 1-18 * table 1 *
by applicantUS5879805
 US4324939
 US3966697
 US4285833
 US3498963
 US3522332
 US4182813
 US5548045
 US7009013
 IT1349141
 IT1349142
 IT1349143
 WO2011061151
 US5128295
 US5258475
 EP0277003
 EP0495375
 EP0520732
 EP0427697
 EP0421659
 EP0418044
 WO9200333
 WO9205208
    - TAKEUCHI Y. ET AL., New Industrial Polymers, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM SERIES, (1974), vol. 4, pages 15 - 25
    - HALASA A. F ET AL., Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1989), vol. 8, pages 1031 - 1045
    - TATE D. ET AL., Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1989), vol. 2, pages 537 - 590
    - "Butadiene Polymers", KERNS M. ET AL., Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Technology, WILEY, (2003), vol. 5, pages 317 - 356
    - PORRI L. ET AL., Comprehensive Polymer Science, PERGAMON PRESS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 53 - 108
    - THIELE S. K. H. ET AL., MACROMOLECULAR SCIENCE. PART C: POLYMER REVIEWS, (2003), vol. C43, pages 581 - 628
    - OSAKADA, K. ET AL., ADVANCED POLYMER SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 171, pages 137 - 194
    - RICCI G. ET AL., Advances in Organometallic Chemistry Research, OVA SCIENCE PUBLISHER, INC., (2007), pages 1 - 36
    - RICCI G. ET AL., COORDINATION CHEMISTRY REVIEWS, (2010), vol. 254, pages 661 - 676
    - RICCI G. ET AL., Cobalt: Characteristics, Compounds, and Applications, NOVA SCIENCE PUBLISHER, INC., (2011), pages 39 - 81
    - RACANELLI P. ET AL., EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, (1970), vol. 6, pages 751 - 761
    - RICCI G. ET AL., POLYMER COMMUNICATION, (1991), vol. 32, pages 514 - 517
    - FURUKAWA J. ET AL., POLYMER JOURNAL, (1971), vol. 2, pages 371 - 378
    - ASHITAKA H ET AL., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (1983), vol. 21, pages 1853 - 1860
    - ASHITAKA H. ET AL., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (1983), vol. 21, pages 1951 - 1972
    - ASHITAKA H. ET AL., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (1983), vol. 21, pages 1973 - 1988
    - ASHITAKA H. ET AL., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (1983), vol. 21, pages 1989 - 1995
    - NATTA G. ET AL., CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (1967), pages 1263 - 1265
    - RICCI G. ET AL., POLYMER COMMUNICATION, (1988), vol. 29, pages 305 - 307
    - RICCI G. ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2005), vol. 38, pages 1064 - 1070
    - RICCI G. ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 690, pages 1845 - 1854
    - TAKEUCHI M. ET AL., POLYMER INTERNATIONAL, (1992), vol. 29, pages 209 - 212
    - TAKEUCHI M. ET AL., POLYMER INTERNATIONAL, (1995), vol. 36, pages 41 - 45
    - TAKEUCHI M. ET AL., MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, (1996), vol. 197, pages 729 - 743
    - DIERKES P. ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (1999), pages 1519 - 1530
    - VAN LEEUWEN P. ET AL., CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (2000), vol. 100, pages 2741 - 2769
    - FREIXA Z. ET AL., DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (2003), pages 1890 - 1901
    - TOLMAN C., CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1977), vol. 77, pages 313 - 348
    - RICCI G. ET AL., Advances in Organometallic Chemistry Research, NOVA SCIENCE PUBLISHER, INC., (2007), pages 1 - 36
    - RICCI G. ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, (2005), vol. 226, pages 235 - 241
    - ENDO K. ET AL., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 44, pages 4088 - 4094
    - CARIOU R. ET AL., DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (2010), vol. 39, pages 9039 - 9045
    - APPUKUTTAN ET AL., POLYMER, (2009), vol. 50, pages 1150 - 1158
    - GONG D. ET AL., POLYMER, (2009), vol. 50, pages 6259 - 6264
    - APPUKUTTAN V., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, (2010), vol. 325, pages 84 - 90
    - GONG D., JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 696, pages 1584 - 1590
    - JIE S. ET AL., DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (2011), vol. 40, pages 10975 - 10982
    - AI P. ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (2012), vol. 705, pages 51 - 58
    - L. K. JOHNSON ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1995), vol. 117, pages 6414 - 6415
    - G. VAN KOTEN ET AL., ADVANCES IN ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 21, pages 151 - 239
    - VAN DER POEL H. ET AL., SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATION, (1978), vol. 8, page 305
    - SVOBODA M. ET AL., ZEITSCHRIFT FUER NATURFOSCHUNG, (1981), pages 814 - 822
    - DIECK H. ET AL., ZEITSCHRIFT FUER NATURFOSCHUNG, (1981), pages 823 - 832
    - DIECK H. ET AL., ZEITSCHRIFT FUER NATURFOSCHUNG, (1975), pages 922 - 925
    - KLIEGMAN J. M. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1970), vol. 26, pages 2555 - 2560
    - KLIEGMAN J. M. ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1970), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 3140 - 3143
    - BARNEY V. C. ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1953), pages 3610 - 3612
    - HORNER L. ET AL., CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, (1957), vol. 90, pages 2184 - 2189
    - CARSON J. F. ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1953), vol. 75, pages 4337 - 4338
    - DOVE A. P. ET AL., DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (2004), pages 570 - 578
    - BOURGET-MERLE L. ET AL., CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 102, pages 3031 - 3065
    - BUDZELAAR P. H. ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2000), pages 753 - 769
    - W. BECK ET AL., CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1988), vol. 88, pages 1405 - 1421
    - S. H. STARES, CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1993), vol. 93, pages 927 - 942
    - MOCHEL, V. D., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE PART A-1: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 1009 - 1018