EP2882362 - ABLATION SYSTEMS, DEVICES AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fractyl Health, Inc. 17 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2021/32] |
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states Fractyl Laboratories Inc. 221 Crescent Street, Suite 102a Waltham, MA 02453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPLAN, Jay 34 Clark Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 02 /
LEVIN, Phillip S. 11 Southwood Road Storrs, CT 06268 / US | 03 /
COATS, Andrew 73 Beacon Street, 3 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 04 /
RAJAGOPALAN, Harith 150 St. Paul Street, 501 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 05 /
MANASAS, Mark A. 6 Bennett Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 06 /
FLAHERTY, J. Christopher 2122 Kirkland Lake Drive Auburndale, FL 33823 / US | [2024/01] |
Former [2015/29] | 01 /
CAPLAN, Jay 34 Clark Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | ||
02 /
LEVIN, Phillip, S. 11 Southwood Road Storrs, CT 06268 / US | |||
03 /
COATS, Andrew 73 Beacon Street, 3 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | |||
04 /
RAJAGOPALAN, Harith 150 St. Paul Street, 501 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | |||
05 /
MANASAS, Mark, A. 6 Bennett Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | |||
06 /
FLAHERTY, J., Christopher 2122 Kirkland Lake Drive Auburndale, FL 33823 / US | |||
Former [2015/25] | 01 /
CAPLAN, Jay 34 Clark Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | ||
02 /
LEVIN, Phillip, S. 11 Southwood Road Storrs, CT 06268 / US | |||
03 /
COATS, Andrew 22 Kidder Avenue Somerville, MA 02144 / US | |||
04 /
RAJAGOPALAN, Harith 150 St. Paul Street, 501 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | |||
05 /
MANASAS, Mark, A. 6 Bennett Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | |||
06 /
FLAHERTY, J., Christopher 2122 Kirkland Lake Drive Auburndale, FL 33823 / US | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/01] |
Former [2015/25] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13827149.9 | 08.08.2013 | [2024/01] | WO2013US54219 | Priority number, date | US201261681502P | 09.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261681502 P | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014026055 | Date: | 13.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2882362 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2882362 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/04, A61B17/3203, A61M25/01, A61B1/12, A61B17/94, A61B18/14, A61B18/24, A61B18/06, A61N7/02, A61B17/00, A61B18/00, A61B18/02 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
A61B18/04 (EP,US);
A61B18/06 (EP,US);
A61M25/1002 (US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B18/24 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00269 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00017 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00494 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00994 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,US);
A61B2018/046 (EP,US);
A61B2018/048 (EP,US);
A61M2025/105 (US);
A61N7/022 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/25] | A61B18/04, A61B17/3203, A61M25/01, A61B1/12, A61B17/94 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABLATIONSSYSTEME, VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWEBEBEHANDLUNG | [2015/25] | English: | ABLATION SYSTEMS, DEVICES AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF TISSUE | [2015/25] | French: | SYSTÈMES, DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ABLATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN TISSU | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 14.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005222558 (BAXTER LINCOLN S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0133] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0141]; figures 1, 12 *; | [A]US2005251116 (STEINKE TOM A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0067] ** paragraph [0097]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2011160648 (HOEY MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0127]; figures 6A, 6B, 12A *; | [X]WO2012099974 (FRACTYL LAB INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0163] - paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0187] * * paragraph [0201] - paragraph [0213]; figures 3, 4 * | International search | [X]US2003093072 (FRIEDMAN PAUL [US]); | [X]US2004215296 (GANZ ROBERT A [US], et al); | [X]US2008275445 (KELLY DOUGLAS [US], et al); | [A]US2011172659 (BRANNAN JOSEPH D [US]); | [X]WO2012099974 (FRACTYL LAB INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US2011160648 | WO2012099974 |