Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2880864

EP2880864 - SCANNING TWO-WAY LIGHT FIELD CAMERA AND DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.05.2015
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lapstun, Paul
PO Box 288
Collaroy Beach
New South Wales 2097 / AU
[2017/52]
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
Lapstun, Paul
13 Duke Avenue
Rodd Point NSW 2046 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2015/24]
Application number, filing date13827401.405.08.2013
WO2013IB56412
Priority number, dateUS20121356701004.08.2012         Original published format: US201213567010
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014024121
Date:13.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2880864
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU13.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/04, G02B26/00, G09G3/00, H04N13/02, G02B26/10, G02B26/08, G02B27/22, G02B27/00, G09G3/02, G06T19/00, H04N5/225, H04N5/232
[2016/23]
Former International [2015/24]H04N13/04, G02B26/00, G09G3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
TitleGerman:BIDIREKTIONALE LICHTFELDABTASTKAMERA UND ANZEIGE DAFÜR[2015/24]
English:SCANNING TWO-WAY LIGHT FIELD CAMERA AND DISPLAY[2015/24]
French:CAMÉRA DE CHAMP CLAIR BIDIRECTIONNELLE À BALAYAGE ET AFFICHEUR[2015/24]
Entry into regional phase02.03.2015National basic fee paid 
02.03.2015Search fee paid 
02.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
06.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201503   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2016
31.08.201604   M06   Fee paid on   05.12.2016
31.08.201705   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2002117605  (ALDEN RAY M [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0197] * * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2010060551  (SUGIYAMA KEIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [00 5] , [0 95] , [ 285] * * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006028400  (LAPSTUN PAUL [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] * * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002014579  (DUNFIELD JOHN C [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0083] * * the whole document *
 [Y]  - FLORAINE BERTHOUZOZ ET AL, "Resolution enhancement by vibrating displays", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS (TOG), US, (20120401), vol. 31, no. 2, doi:10.1145/2159516.2159521, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 1 - 14, XP055268491 [Y] 13 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2159516.2159521
International search[A]US8223195  (KUROKI YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al);
 [A]US2006192869  (YOSHINO KAZUTORA [US], et al);
 [A]EP2398235  (BRONSTEIN BRONSTEIN KIMMEL TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL])