Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789107

EP2789107 - A DIGITAL CAPACITY CENTRIC DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/42]A DIGITAL CAPACTIY CENTRIC DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM
[2017/06]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Axell Wireless Ltd.
Aerial House
26 Asheridge Road
Chesham Buckinghamshire HP5 2QD / GB
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / HASARCHI, Abraham
c/o Axell Wireless Limited
6 Bareket St. P.O. Box 10241
49002 Petach Tikva / IL
02 / MEIR, Amir
c/o Axell Wireless Limited
6 Bareket St. P.O. Box 10241
49002 Petach Tikva / IL
03 / LEWIS, Michael John, George
c/o Axell Wireless Limited
Aerial House
26 Asheridge Road
Chesham Buckinghamshire HP5 2QD / GB
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Zweibrückenstraße 5-7
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
Former [2014/42]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date13827591.208.08.2013
[2017/07]
WO2013US54143
Priority number, dateUS201261681227P09.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261681227 P
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014026005
Date:13.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789107
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789107
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/04, // H04W84/04, H04W88/08
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/42]H04B7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUF DIGITALE KAPAZITÄT ZENTRIERTES VERTEILTES ANTENNENSYSTEM[2014/42]
English:A DIGITAL CAPACITY CENTRIC DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM[2017/06]
French:SYSTÈME D'ANTENNE DISTRIBUÉ CENTRÉ SUR CAPACITÉ NUMÉRIQUE[2014/42]
Former [2014/42]A DIGITAL CAPACTIY CENTRIC DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM
Entry into regional phase04.04.2014National basic fee paid 
04.04.2014Search fee paid 
04.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
06.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2016Fee for grant paid
19.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.09.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.11.2017  20.11.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Lee, Manuel
Feldanger 9
80939 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ege Lee & Partner Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Walter-Gropius-Straße 15
80807 München / DE
 02  15.11.2017   
Lee, Manuel
Feldanger 9
80939 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ege Lee & Partner Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Walter-Gropius-Straße 15
80807 München / DE
 [2017/52]
18.12.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.04.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.08.2013
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
IE08.08.2017
LU08.08.2017
MT08.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
IE08.08.2017
LU08.08.2017
MT08.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
IE08.08.2017
LU08.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
Former [2018/34]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
IE08.08.2017
LU08.08.2017
Former [2018/18]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007243899  (HERMEL MICHAEL J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [0 32] - [0046] *;
 [A]US2012057572  (EVANS ALLAN M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] *
International search[X]US2012189074  (HANG JIN ET AL.);
 [A]US2012134279  (TSUYOSHI TAMAKI);
 [A]US2012046038  (LONG GAO ET AL.);
 [A]US2012106404  (JELENA M. DAMNJANOVIC);
 [A]KR20110085828  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.)
OppositionUS2007243899
 US6785558  * . *
 WO2012054553  * . *
 US2012039320  * . *
 US6963552  * . *
 US2010278530  * . *
 US6873823  * . *
 US2010265848  * . *
 WO2011156465  * . *
 US7035671  * . *
 US2007135056  * . *
 US2011201269  * . *
 US2005176368  * . *
 US2009061940  * . *
 US8126510  * . *
 US2002186436
 US7039399  * . *
 US2010177759  * . *
 US2010190519  * . *
 US6415132  * . *
 US2013017863  * . *
 US2012314797  * . *
 US2013051278  * . *