Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2883630

EP2883630 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ROUND BILLET OF NI-CONTAINING HIGH ALLOY HAVING IMPROVED INTERNAL QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/25]PROCESS FOR PRODUCING NI-CONTAINING HIGH-ALLOY ROUND BILLET HAVING EXCELLENT INTERNAL QUALITY
[2019/08]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
[2019/36]
Former [2015/25]For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAMOTO, Seiji
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / KAGARI, Takayoshi
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2015/25]Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date13827694.408.08.2013
[2019/15]
WO2013JP71538
Priority number, dateJP2012017740609.08.2012         Original published format: JP 2012177406
[2015/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014024983
Date:13.02.2014
Language:JA
[2014/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2883630
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2883630
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:B22D11/12, B21B19/04, C21D7/13, C22C19/05, C22C38/44
[2016/24]
Former International [2015/25]B22D11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RUNDEN STANGEN MIT NI-ENTHALTENDER HOCHLEGIERUNG MIT VERBESSERTER INNENQUALITÄT[2019/08]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ROUND BILLET OF NI-CONTAINING HIGH ALLOY HAVING IMPROVED INTERNAL QUALITY[2019/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE BILLETTE RONDE FORTEMENT ALLIÉE CONTENANT DU NI, AYANT UNE QUALITÉ INTERNE AMÉLIORÉE[2019/08]
Former [2015/25]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG NI-HALTIGER HOCHLEGIERTER RUNDER STANGEN MIT HERVORRAGENDER INNENQUALITÄT
Former [2015/25]PROCESS FOR PRODUCING NI-CONTAINING HIGH-ALLOY ROUND BILLET HAVING EXCELLENT INTERNAL QUALITY
Former [2015/25]PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE BILLETTE RONDE FORTEMENT ALLIÉE CONTENANT DU NI AYANT UNE EXCELLENTE QUALITÉ INTERNE
Entry into regional phase21.05.2014Translation filed 
21.05.2014National basic fee paid 
21.05.2014Search fee paid 
21.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.2014Examination requested  [2015/25]
20.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2019Fee for grant paid
23.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]AL10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
Former [2019/44]NL10.04.2019
Documents cited:Search[YD]JP2009120875  (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [YD] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [Y]FR2667524  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 10; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2012086179  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH10192901  (NIPPON KOKAN KK);
 [A]JPH08232018  (NIPPON STEEL CORP)
ExaminationJP2008214713
by applicantJP2009120875