Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2886484

EP2886484 - CONTAINER AND COVER ANCHORING STRUCTURE THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shanghai Hongyan Returnable Transit Packagings Co., Ltd.
Room 1105, No. 20 Building
No. 487 Tianlin Rd.
Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / JIAN, Yuanli
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Room 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 487 TianLin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
02 / SU, Yongping
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Room 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 487 TianLin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
03 / GONG, Kai
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Room 1105, No. 20 Building
NO. 487 TianLin RD, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2015/26]
Application number, filing date13829319.616.08.2013
[2018/03]
WO2013CN81668
Priority number, dateCN20121029274516.08.2012         Original published format: CN201210292745
[2015/26]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014026648
Date:20.02.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2886484
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2886484
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN20.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:B65D43/02
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTER UND DECKELVERANKERUNGSSTRUKTUR DARAUF[2015/26]
English:CONTAINER AND COVER ANCHORING STRUCTURE THEREON[2015/26]
French:RÉCIPIENT ET STRUCTURE D'ANCRAGE DE COUVERCLE UTILISÉE SUR CELUI-CI[2015/26]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2015Translation filed 
12.03.2015National basic fee paid 
12.03.2015Search fee paid 
12.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
08.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.10.2017Fee for grant paid
02.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2017
Opposition(s)18.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
IE16.08.2018
LU16.08.2018
MT16.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/33]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
IE16.08.2018
LU16.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
LU16.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
GR18.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE102005008695  (KTP KUNSTSTOFF PALETTENTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-10;
 [XP]EP2537769  (KTP KUNSTSTOFF PALETTENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-5c; claims 1-11 *;
 [I]DE9408039U  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [I] 1-10 * page 7, line 1 - page 10, paragraph l; figures 1-7; claims 1-11 *;
 [I]US2006012202  (SAKAKIBARA YASUHIRO [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2-8b; claims 1-10 *
International search[XP]CN202717140U  (SHANGHAI HOREN SCI&TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.);
 [XP]CN102807028  (SHANGHAI HOREN SCI&TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.);
 [X]CN2732150Y  (JIAN, WEIWEN);
 [A]US4320852  (NAGELKIRK);
 [A]DE102009024081  (KTP KUNSTSTOFF PALETTENTECHNIK);
 [A]US4448327  (GAHM)
by applicantDE102009024081