Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2885552

EP2885552 - DISC BRAKE PAD MOUNTING AND RETENTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / PLANTAN, Ronald, S.
193 Plantation Drive
Morresville, NC 28117 / US
02 / RADHAKRISHNAN, Harish
1506 Crossings Parkway
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
03 / WOLF, Dennis, A.
31323 Detroit Road
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
04 / LANTZ, Richard, L.
2532 Shadow Lane
Clinton, OH 44216 / US
05 / ROBERTS, Will, E.
1011 Lake Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
06 / BELL, Steven, C.
183 Westchester Drive
Amherst, OH 44001 / US
 [2015/38]
Former [2015/26]01 / PLANTAN, Ronald, S.
348 Brittany Lane
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
02 / RADHAKRISHNAN, Harish
1506 Crossings Parkway
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
03 / WOLF, Dennis, A.
31323 Detroit Road
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
04 / LANTZ, Richard, L.
2532 Shadow Lane
Clinton, OH 44216 / US
05 / ROBERTS, Will, E.
1011 Lake Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
06 / BELL, Steven, C.
183 Westchester Drive
Amherst, OH 44001 / US
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13829676.913.08.2013
WO2013US54680
Priority number, dateUS20121358850017.08.2012         Original published format: US201213588500
[2015/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014028456
Date:20.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2885552
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014
[2015/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16D55/00, F16D65/095
[2016/28]
Former International [2015/26]F16D55/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHEIBENBREMSBELAGMONTAGE UND -FIXIERUNG[2015/26]
English:DISC BRAKE PAD MOUNTING AND RETENTION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2015/26]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE ET DE RETENUE DE PLAQUETTES DE FREINS À DISQUE[2015/26]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2015National basic fee paid 
16.03.2015Search fee paid 
16.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
29.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5564532  (BABA HARUHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * column 5, line 56 - column 14, line 2; figure - *;
 [X]US6272914  (CIOTTI ALESSANDRO [IT]) [X] 10 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 20; figure - *;
 [XA]US4473137  (GERARD JEAN-LOUIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 25; figure - * [A] 10-15;
 [A]EP0138081  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 2 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 3; figure 4 *;
 [A]DE2211013  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 5-9 * page 4, line 20 - page 8, line 21; figure - *
International search[X]US3942612  (LE MARCHAND CLAUDE, et al);
 [X]US4068743  (KARASUDANI YASUO, et al);
 [Y]US6272914  (CIOTTI ALESSANDRO [IT])
by applicantDE4032886
 US5564532