Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2885553

EP2885553 - DISC BRAKE PAD MOUNTING AND RETENTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC
901 Cleveland Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / PLANTAN, Ronald, S.
193 Plantation Drive
Morresville, NC 28117 / US
02 / RADHAKRISHNAN, Harish
1506 Crossings Parkway
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
03 / WOLF, Dennis, A.
31323 Detroit Road
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
04 / LANTZ, Richard, L.
2532 Shadow Lane
Clinton, OH 44216 / US
05 / ROBERTS, Will, E.
1011 Lake Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
06 / BELL, Steven, C.
183 Westchester Drive
Amherst, OH 44001 / US
 [2015/38]
Former [2015/26]01 / PLANTAN, Ronald, S.
348 Brittany Lane
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
02 / RADHAKRISHNAN, Harish
1506 Crossings Parkway
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
03 / WOLF, Dennis, A.
31323 Detroit Road
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
04 / LANTZ, Richard, L.
2532 Shadow Lane
Clinton, OH 44216 / US
05 / ROBERTS, Will, E.
1011 Lake Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
06 / BELL, Steven, C.
183 Westchester Drive
Amherst, OH 44001 / US
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13829836.913.08.2013
WO2013US54678
Priority number, dateUS20121358852717.08.2012         Original published format: US201213588527
[2015/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014028454
Date:20.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2885553
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014
[2015/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16D55/00
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHEIBENBREMSBELAGMONTAGE UND -FIXIERUNG[2015/26]
English:DISC BRAKE PAD MOUNTING AND RETENTION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2015/26]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE ET DE RETENUE DE PLAQUETTES DE FREINS À DISQUE[2015/26]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2015National basic fee paid 
16.03.2015Search fee paid 
16.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
23.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]FR2334011  (DBA [FR]) [X] 1-3,7,9,13-15 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 7; figure 1 * [Y] 4,6,10,12 [I] 5,8,11;
 [XYI]US4174769  (GERARD JEAN L [FR]) [X] 1-3,7,9,13-15 * column 2, lines 35-57; figure 1 * [Y] 4,6,10,12 [I] 5,8,11;
 [Y]US2004222050  (BERINGER GILBERT [FR]) [Y] 4,6,10,12 * paragraph [0041]; figures 1,4,5 *
International search[Y]US4174769  (GERARD JEAN L [FR]);
 [Y]EP1473481  (BPW BERGISCHE ACHSEN KG [DE]);
 [Y]US3920104  (HOFFMANN FRIEDRICH)