Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2884986

EP2884986 - ASSAYS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING PERSONALIZED ANABOLIC PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Medical Center Corporation
1 Boston Medical Center Plaza
Boston, MA 02118 / US
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / MONTANO, Monty
70 Abbottsford Road
Brookline, Massachusetts 02446 / US
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date13830347.420.08.2013
WO2013US55749
Priority number, dateUS201261684959P20.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261684959 P
[2015/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014031612
Date:27.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2884986
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014
[2015/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/12, C12N5/22
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
TitleGerman:ASSAYS, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG PERSONALISIERTER ANABOLIKAPROFILE[2015/26]
English:ASSAYS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING PERSONALIZED ANABOLIC PROFILES[2015/26]
French:DOSAGES, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'OBTENTION DE PROFILS ANABOLIQUES PERSONNALISÉS[2015/26]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2015National basic fee paid 
27.02.2015Search fee paid 
27.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
22.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
04.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2005079606  (TAMAKI TETSURO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,15,16 * par.10-22, 30-31, 49-69, 123-124, 129, 131 * [I] 12,13;
 [XI]US2009232771  (HINUMA SHUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,15,16 * par.1, 5, 7, 8, 24, 85,117, 128-129, 208-233 * [I] 12,13;
 [XI]US2004229351  (RODRIGUEZ ANNE-MARIE [FR], et al) [X] 1-11,15,16 * par.163-164; claims 1-5, 13, 38, 40-41 * [I] 12,13;
 [A]  - ARIANA DARCY ET AL, "A novel library screen identifies immunosuppressors that promote osteoblast differentiation", BONE, PERGAMON PRESS., OXFORD, GB, vol. 50, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BONE.2012.03.001, ISSN 8756-3282, (20120302), pages 1294 - 1303, (20120313), XP028423838 [A] 1-13,15,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bone.2012.03.001
 [A]  - HERMAN VANDENBURGH, "High-Content Drug Screening with Engineered Musculoskeletal Tissues", TISSUE ENGINEERING PART B-REVIEWS, US, (20100201), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1089/ten.teb.2009.0445, ISSN 1937-3368, pages 55 - 64, XP055266333 [A] 1-13,15,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.teb.2009.0445
International search[Y]WO2006084040  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al);
 [Y]US6713249  (HRUSKA KEITH [US], et al);
 [Y]US7383134  (PIPER JAMES R [GB], et al)
 [Y]  - DEWITT, DD ET AL., "Collagen I-Matrigel Scaffolds For Enhanced Schwann Cell Survival And Control Of Three-Dimensional Cell Morphology.", TISSUE ENGINEERING PART A., (200910), vol. 15, pages 2785 - 2793, XP055192782

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.tea.2008.0406