Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2888644

EP2888644 - FLEXIBLE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/27]
Inventor(s)01 / KWON, Giang-yoon
105-1902 Hyundai Hometown
Amsa-dong
Gangdong-gu
Seoul 134-050 / KR
02 / PARK, So-young
416-904 Mokdong 4-danji Apt.
Mok 5-dong
Yangcheon-gu
Seoul 158-754 / KR
03 / SHIN, Seung-woo
102-2202 Taeyoung Desian Apt.
Pungdeokcheon 2-dong
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-172 / KR
04 / EOM, Tae-won
209-1805 Hangaram Apt.
Ichon 1-dong
Yongsan-gu
Seoul 140-728 / KR
05 / LEE, Chang-soo
103-605 Samsung Apt.
Jukseong-dong
Seosan-si Chungcheongnam-do 356-760 / KR
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/49]
Former [2015/27]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13830351.623.08.2013
[2019/49]
WO2013KR07562
Priority number, dateKR2012009262923.08.2012         Original published format: KR 20120092629
[2015/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014030954
Date:27.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2888644
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014
[2015/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2888644
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, G06F1/16, G06F3/0488
[2016/04]
Former International [2015/27]G06F3/01, G06F3/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2015/27]
English:FLEXIBLE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF[2015/27]
French:APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE FLEXIBLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE[2015/27]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2015National basic fee paid 
20.01.2015Search fee paid 
20.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
29.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2019Fee for grant paid
29.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19211212.6
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2166443  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0097]; figure 15 * * paragraph [0100]; figure 18 * * paragraph [0101]; figure 19 *;
 [A]US2012092363  (KIM JAE MIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0080]; figure 10 *
International search[Y]US2010302179  (AHN HYE-SANG [KR], et al);
 [Y]US2010031169  (JANG SE-YOON [KR], et al);
 [A]US2010117975  (CHO YOUNG MIN [KR]);
 [A]US2010064244  (KILPATRICK II THOMAS E [US], et al);
 [A]US2011109567  (KIM HYUN-KOOK [KR])
ExaminationUS2010141605
by applicantEP2166443