blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2886109

EP2886109 - MEDICAMENT-CONTAINING HOLLOW PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.11.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.06.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co., Ltd.
6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-8524 / JP
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / KOBIKI, Mitsuaki
c/o Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co., Ltd.
3-45 Kurakakiuchi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0878 / JP
02 / OCHIAI, Yasushi
c/o Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co., Ltd.
3-45 Kurakakiuchi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0878 / JP
 [2020/50]
Former [2015/26]01 / KOBIKI, Mitsuaki
c/o Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co. Ltd.
3-45 Kurakakiuchi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0878 / JP
02 / OCHIAI, Yasushi
c/o Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co. Ltd.
3-45 Kurakakiuchi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0878 / JP
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
80 Turnmill Street
London EC1M 5QU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2020/50]J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2015/26]Duckworth, Timothy John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date13830393.820.08.2013
[2020/50]
WO2013JP72227
Priority number, dateWO2012JP7101620.08.2012         Original published format: PCT/JP2012/071016
[2015/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014030656
Date:27.02.2014
Language:JA
[2014/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2886109
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2886109
Date:09.12.2020
Language:EN
[2020/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2015
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/50, A61K9/14, A61K47/32, A61K47/34, A61K47/38, A61K9/16, A61K9/20
[2016/02]
CPC:
A61K9/1676 (EP,US); A61K9/1652 (KR,US); A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (US); A61K31/423 (EP,US); A61K31/4375 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US); A61K31/5377 (EP,US); A61K31/606 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (KR); A61K9/167 (US); A61K9/1682 (US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,KR,US); A61K9/5021 (EP,KR,US); A61K9/0065 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2015/26]A61K9/50, A61K9/14, A61K47/32, A61K47/34, A61K47/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ARZNEIMITTELHALTIGE HOHLPARTIKEL[2015/26]
English:MEDICAMENT-CONTAINING HOLLOW PARTICLE[2015/26]
French:PARTICULE CREUSE CONTENANT UN MÉDICAMENT[2015/26]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2015Translation filed 
11.03.2015National basic fee paid 
11.03.2015Search fee paid 
11.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
08.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2020Fee for grant paid
29.10.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.10.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP20203011.0  / EP3791867
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2018
Opposition(s)10.09.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
13.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.08.2013
AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CY09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
ES09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
MC09.12.2020
MK09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
IE20.08.2021
LU20.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU20.08.2013
AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CY09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
ES09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
MC09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
IE20.08.2021
LU20.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
Former [2023/29]HU20.08.2013
AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
ES09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
MC09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
IE20.08.2021
LU20.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
Former [2022/35]AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
ES09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
MC09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
IE20.08.2021
LU20.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
Former [2022/34]AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
ES09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
MC09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
LU20.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
Former [2022/23]AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
ES09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
MC09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
LU20.08.2021
Former [2022/18]AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
ES09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
MC09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2022/10]AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
ES09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/51]AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
ES09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/49]AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
DK09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SI09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/48]AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
IT09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/45]AL09.12.2020
AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/42]AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
IS09.04.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/39]AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
PL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/37]AT09.12.2020
CZ09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/36]CZ09.12.2020
EE09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/35]CZ09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
RO09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SK09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/34]CZ09.12.2020
FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/33]FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LT09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
PT09.04.2021
Former [2021/32]FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
SM09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
Former [2021/30]FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
NL09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
Former [2021/28]FI09.12.2020
HR09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
Former [2021/24]FI09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
BG09.03.2021
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
Former [2021/23]FI09.12.2020
LV09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
SE09.12.2020
NO09.03.2021
GR10.03.2021
Former [2021/22]FI09.12.2020
RS09.12.2020
NO09.03.2021
Former [2021/20]FI09.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5057323  (NIWA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, lines 6-9, 28-36, 46-49,64-68 * * column 2, lines 1-7, 48-57 * * column 4; example 1 *;
 [Y]WO2009115579  (NAT UNIV IRELAND [IE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, lines 6-10 * * page 5, lines 22-24 ** page 9, lines 8-10,13-14 *;
 [X]  - HAPGOOD K P ET AL, "Agglomeration of hydrophobic powders via solid spreading nucleation", POWDER TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 188, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.POWTEC.2008.05.004, ISSN 0032-5910, (20090110), pages 248 - 254, (20080528), XP025716957 [X] 1-15 * item 2.3 small scale granulation; page 249, column left; table 1 * * page 249, column right; table 2 * * page 251, column left, paragraph 2 * * page 253; figure 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.powtec.2008.05.004
International search[X]JPS63150220  (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO);
 [X]JPH0296516  (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO);
 [X]JPH03130214  (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO);
 [X]JP2003096108  (NEW IND RES ORGANIZATION);
 [X]JP2004002582  (MIYAZAKI PREFECTURE);
 [X]WO2011019043  (DAINIPPON SUMITOMO PHARMA CO [JP], et al);
 [X]JP2011518234  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.);
 [X]JP2012056859  (TOA YAKUHIN KK);
 [X]  - YOSHIAKI KAWASHIMA, "Control Release Kizai to shite no Bifunka Tei Chikando Hydroxypropylcellulose (L-HPC) no Shisshiki Zoryu ni yoru Joho Seino Henka", JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF POWDER TECHNOLOGY, JAPAN, (1992), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 456 - 459, XP055228141

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4164/sptj.29.456
 [X]  - YUKO MIYAKE, "Formulation Design of Oral- Disintegrating Tablets -Screening of Disintegrants for Fast Disintegration", REPORTS OF THE MIE PREFECTURE INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE, (2010), vol. 34, pages 30 - 37, XP008178094
 [X]  - YUKO MIYAKE, "Formulation Design of Oral- Disintegrating Tablets (Part 2) Compression by Rotary Tableting Machine and Prevention of Capping (Agitating Granulation)", REPORTS OF THE MIE PREFECTURE INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE, (2011), vol. 35, pages 22 - 27, XP008178095
by applicantJPH03130214
 JP2000072660
 JP2000128774
 WO2011019043
    - REPORTS OF THE MIE PREFECTURE INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE, (2010), vol. 34, pages 30 - 37
    - Dissolution Test Method Paddle Method
    - Dissolution Test Method Paddle Method of the Japanese Pharmacopoeia
    - Japanese Pharmacopoeia
    - Dissolution Test Method 2 of the Japanese Pharmacopoeia
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.