Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801902

EP2801902 - PARTITION DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2017/49]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Shouyu
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2017/49]
Former [2014/46]Barth, Stephan Manuel
Isarpatent
Friedrichstraße 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date13831368.925.04.2013
[2017/49]
WO2013CN74683
Priority number, dateCN20121030110622.08.2012         Original published format: CN201210301106
[2014/46]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014029218
Date:27.02.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801902
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801902
Date:06.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN27.02.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/06, // G06F17/30, G11B27/32
[2017/14]
Former International [2015/09]G06F3/14, G06F17/30
Former International [2014/46]G06F3/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PARTITIONSANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG[2014/46]
English:PARTITION DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STORAGE DEVICE[2014/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE DE PARTITIONS POUR DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase05.08.2014Translation filed 
05.08.2014National basic fee paid 
05.08.2014Search fee paid 
05.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
21.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
20.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2017Fee for grant paid
26.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.04.2015
Opposition(s)07.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
IE25.04.2018
LU25.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/12]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
LU25.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
LU25.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/51]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/38]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/37]CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/34]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/24]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
NO06.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2284759  (WALTON ADVANCED ENG INC [TW]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figures 2,22-24,43-45 * [I] 3-8,11-15;
 [X]US5652863  (ASENSIO MIGUEL FERNANDO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5581797  (BAKER MARLA J [US], et al) [A] 6,7,14,15 * column 4, line 57 - line 65 *
 [XI]  - Curtis Gedak, "GParted -- Screenshots", (20120804), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120804154021/http://gparted.sourceforge.net/screenshots.php, (20150113), XP055161861 [X] 1-5,9-13 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,14,15
 [AP]  - Anonymous, "GParted -- GParted Manual", (20121008), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120908051733/http://gparted.sourceforge.net/display-doc.php?name=help-manual, (20150113), XP055161863 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[XP]CN102902499  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD);
 [A]US2003208322  (AOKI KIYOKO F [US], et al);
 [A]JP2007304650  (CANON KK);
 [A]US2010332912  (EIDE CURTIS S [US], et al)
Examination   - Anonymous, "DiskSavvy - Disk Space Analyzer - DiskSavvy GUI Screenshots", (20120220), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120220094830/http://www.disksavvy.com/disksavvy_screenshots.html, (20160608), XP055278877
    - Anonymous, "Coriolis Systems :: Products :: iPartition", (20120618), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120618121402/http://www.coriolis-systems.com/iPartition, (20160608), XP055278890