Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2938353

EP2938353 - ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique (INRA)
147, rue de l'Université
75338 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2015/45]
Inventor(s)01 / LANGELLA Philippe
4 avenue du Général de Gaulle
78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR
02 / PIGNEUR-ARNAUD, Bénédicte
47 rue de la Procession
75015 Paris / FR
03 / CHATEL, Jean-Marc
31 Bd Verd de St Julien
92190 Meudon / FR
04 / TRUGNAN, Germain
6, avenue Pasteur
93100 Montreuil / FR
05 / QUEVRAIN, Elodie
13 rue de la Marne
94170 Le Perreux sur Marne / FR
06 / SEKSIK, Philippe
9 rue de Tunis
75011 Paris / FR
07 / BERMUDEZ-HUMARAN, Luis G.
50 ter, rue Charles de Gaule
Appt 14
78350 Jouy en Josas / FR
08 / CHAIN, Florian
79 rue Albert Sarraut
78000 Versailles / FR
09 / MAUBERT, Marie-Anne
8, Square du Laonnais
75019 Paris / FR
10 / SOKOL, Harry
9 rue du Dr Finlay
75018 Paris / FR
11 / MICHON, Christophe
7 Avenue Quesnay
93190 Livry-Gargan / FR
 [2018/33]
Former [2015/45]01 / LANGELLA Philippe
4 avenue du Général de Gaulle
78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR
02 / PIGNEUR-ARNAUD, Bénédicte.
47 rue de la Procession
75015 Paris / FR
03 / CHATEL, Jean-Marc.
31 Bd Verd de St Julien
92190 Meudon / FR
04 / TRUGNAN, Germain.
6, avenue Pasteur
93100 Montreuil / FR
05 / QUEVRAIN, Elodie.
13 rue de la Marne
94170 Le Perreux sur Marne / FR
06 / SENSIK, Philippe.
9 rue de Tunis
75011 Paris / FR
07 / BERMUDEZ-HUMARAN, Luis G.
50 ter, rue Charles de Gaule
Appt 14
78350 Jouy en Josas / FR
08 / CHAIN, Florian.
79 rue Albert Sarraut
78000 Versailles / FR
09 / MAUBERT, Marie-Anne.
8, Square du Laonnais
75019 Paris / FR
10 / SOKOL, Harry.
9 rue du Dr Finlay
75018 Paris / FR
11 / MICHON, Christophe.
7 Avenue Quesnay
93190 Livry-Gargan / FR
Representative(s)Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/45]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date13831825.826.12.2013
[2015/45]
WO2013EP03917
Priority number, dateEP2012000861126.12.2012         Original published format: EP 12008611
[2015/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014102009
Date:03.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2938353
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014
[2015/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2938353
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/16
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE PEPTIDE[2015/45]
English:ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PEPTIDES[2015/45]
French:PEPTIDES ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES[2015/45]
Entry into regional phase27.07.2015National basic fee paid 
27.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
07.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2018Fee for grant paid
02.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.01.2016
Opposition(s)16.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
IE26.12.2018
LU26.12.2018
[2019/48]
Former [2019/40]AL15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
LU26.12.2018
Former [2019/39]AL15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
LU26.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SI15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/24]AL15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NO15.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT15.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]  - SOKOL HARRY ET AL, "Faecalibacterium prausnitzii is an anti-inflammatory commensal bacterium identified by gut microbiota analysis of Crohn disease patients", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 105, no. 43, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0804812105, ISSN 0027-8424, (20081028), pages 16731 - 16736, (20081020), XP002579466 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0804812105
 [A]  - ROSIQUE REBECA MARTIN ET AL, "Protective and Curative Effect of Faecalibacterium prausnitzii in a Chronic DNBS-Induced Murine Colitis", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (201205), Database accession no. PREV201200606260, XP002695881 [A] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(12)61487-5
    [ ] - GASTROENTEROLOGY, DIGESTIVE DISEASE WEEK (DDW); SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; MAY 19 -22, 2012, (201205), vol. 142, no. 5, Suppl. 1, ISSN 0016-5085(print), page S392
by applicantWO9514785
 WO9622378
 US5882877
 US6013516
 US4861719
 US5278056
 WO9419478
    - COOPER HS LAB INVEST, (1993), vol. 69, pages 238 - 49