EP2895295 - SUPERALLOY LASER CLADDING WITH SURFACE TOPOLOGY ENERGY TRANSFER COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUCK, Gerald J. 1325 Fairhaven Court Oviedo, Florida 32766 / US | 02 /
KAMEL, Ahmed 2439 Guiana Plum Drive Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | 03 /
SHINN, Brandon W. 725 International Boulevard 106 Houston, Texas 77024 / US | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13831956.1 | 12.08.2013 | WO2013US54452 | Priority number, date | US201213611034 | 12.09.2012 Original published format: US201213611034 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014070272 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2895295 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/34, B23K26/08 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
B23K26/082 (EP,US);
B23K26/342 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
B23K2103/08 (US);
B23K2103/26 (EP,US);
F01D5/005 (US);
F05D2230/31 (US);
F05D2230/80 (US);
Y10T29/49316 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49318 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49718 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49719 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49721 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49732 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49737 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | LASERPLATTIERUNG EINER SUPERLEGIERUNG MIT OBERFLÄCHENTOPOLOGIE-ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNGSKOMPENSATION | [2015/30] | English: | SUPERALLOY LASER CLADDING WITH SURFACE TOPOLOGY ENERGY TRANSFER COMPENSATION | [2015/30] | French: | GAINAGE LASER DE SUPERALLIAGE AYANT UNE COMPENSATION DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE DE TOPOLOGIE DE SURFACE | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 02.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2019 | Request for further processing for: | 02.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]GB2378150 (DTM CORP [US], et al) [X] 16,20 * page 7, line 19 - page 9, line 2; figure 3 * [Y] 17,18 [I] 19; | [Y]US2004133298 (TOYSERKANI EHSAN [CA], et al) [Y] 2,3,17 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008]; figures 1,4,7 * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0069] *; | [Y]US2004251242 (SUH JEONG-HUN [KR]) [Y] 2,17 * paragraph [0046]; figures 2,4,5,11 * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] ** paragraph [0084] *; | [XYI]GB2453943 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,4,7-10,12-15 * page 7 - page 14; figure 7 * [Y] 3,18 [I] 5,6,11; | [Y]DE102010060162 (SCANSONIC MI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,17 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XYI]EP2395199 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,8-10,12-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-12 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0068] * [Y] 2,3 [I] 5,6,11 |