Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2891191

EP2891191 - PEC ETCHING OF { 20-2-1 } SEMIPOLAR GALLIUM NITRIDE FOR LIGHT EMITTING DIODES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[2015/28]
Inventor(s)01 / HSU, Chung-Ta
11F, No.2, Sec. 2, Zhongcheng Rd.
Shilin Dist Taipei City 111 / TW
02 / HUANG, Chia-Yen
470 Whitman Street
88
Goleta, California 93117 / US
03 / ZHAO, Yuji
767 Cypress Walk, Apt. E
Goleta, California 93117 / US
04 / HUANG, Shih-Chieh
5829 Encina Road Apt. 204
Goleta, California 93117 / US
05 / FEEZELL, Daniel F.
1822 Morningside Drive NE
Albuquerque, New Mexico 87110 / US
06 / DENBAARS, Steven P.
283 Elderberry Drive
Goleta, California 93117 / US
07 / NAKAMURA, Shuji
P.O. Box 61656
Santa Barbara, California 93160 / US
08 / SPECK, James S.
722 Monte Drive
Santa Barbara, California 93110 / US
 [2015/28]
Representative(s)Jackson, Martin Peter , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2015/28]
Application number, filing date13832078.330.08.2013
WO2013US57527
Priority number, dateUS201261695124P30.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261695124 P
[2015/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014036400
Date:06.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2891191
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014
[2015/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/16, H01L33/32
[2015/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PEC-ÄTZEN VON {20-2-1} SEMIPOLAREM GALLIUMNITRID FÜR LEUCHTDIODEN[2015/28]
English:PEC ETCHING OF { 20-2-1 } SEMIPOLAR GALLIUM NITRIDE FOR LIGHT EMITTING DIODES[2015/28]
French:GRAVURE PEC DE NITRURE DE GALLIUM SEMIPOLAIRE {20-2-1} POUR DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES[2015/28]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2015National basic fee paid 
28.01.2015Search fee paid 
28.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
14.07.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/34]
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2010003492  (D EVELYN MARK P [US]);
 [Y]US2011186863  (LEE IN HWAN [KR], et al);
 [Y]US2004110386  (WOLFF THOMAS [DE]);
 [Y]US2010090240  (TAMBOLI ADELE [US], et al);
 [Y]US2009315055  (TAMBOLI ADELE [US], et al)
 [Y]  - LEE ET AL., "Light output enhancement of GaN-based roughened LEDs using bias-assisted photoelectrochemical etching method.", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 155.10, (2008), pages H707 - H709, URL: http://Iib.semi.ac.cn:8080/tsh/dzzy/wsqk/selected%20papers/Journal%20of%20the%20Electrochemical%20Society/155-H707.pdf, XP055184146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.2956096