Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2888708

EP2888708 - TRANSACTIONAL MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Song, Yuh-Shen
19848 Turtle Springs Way
Northridge, CA 91326 / US
For all designated states
Lew, Catherine
19848 Turtle Springs Way
Northridge, CA 91326 / US
For all designated states
Song, Alexander
19848 Turtle Springs Way
Northridge, CA 91326 / US
For all designated states
Song, Victoria
19848 Turtle Springs Way
Northridge, CA 91326 / US
[2015/27]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/27]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13832534.527.08.2013
WO2013US56840
Priority number, dateUS20121359576827.08.2012         Original published format: US201213595768
[2015/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014035990
Date:06.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2888708
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014
[2015/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06Q40/06
[2016/14]
Former International [2015/27]G06Q40/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
TitleGerman:TRANSAKTIONSÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM[2015/27]
English:TRANSACTIONAL MONITORING SYSTEM[2015/27]
French:SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE TRANSACTIONS[2015/27]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2015National basic fee paid 
27.02.2015Search fee paid 
27.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
04.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US2011055852  (CHRISTOPHER P. SMITH ET AL.);
 [A]US2011055072  (ALVIN LEE ET AL.);
 [A]US2008086342  (EDITH L. CURRY ET AL.);
 [A]US2004117316  (ALBEN JOSEPH GILLUM);
 [A]US2010121833  (MICHAEL JOHNSTON)