Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2892195

EP2892195 - Terminal device and base station for the control of a radio communication service [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/28]COMMUNICATION DEVICE, COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD
[2019/12]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2015/28]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIZAWA, Atsushi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2015/28]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/38]
Former [2015/28]Jackson, Jonathan Andrew
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date13833138.422.05.2013
[2019/38]
WO2013JP64247
Priority number, dateJP2012018874429.08.2012         Original published format: JP 2012188744
[2015/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014034196
Date:06.03.2014
Language:JA
[2014/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2892195
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2892195
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/50, H04W8/18, H04W36/00, H04M1/725, H04L29/08
[2019/12]
Former International [2016/15]H04L29/06, H04M1/00, H04W8/18, H04L29/08, H04M1/725, H04W4/00, H04W36/00
Former International [2015/28]H04L29/06, H04M1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Endgerät und Basisstation für die Steuerung eines Funkkommunikationsdienstes[2019/16]
English:Terminal device and base station for the control of a radio communication service[2019/16]
French:Dispositif terminal et station de base pour le contrôle d'un service de communication radio[2019/16]
Former [2015/28]KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN
Former [2015/28]COMMUNICATION DEVICE, COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD
Former [2015/28]DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION, PROGRAMME, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION
Entry into regional phase23.01.2015Translation filed 
28.02.2015National basic fee paid 
28.02.2015Search fee paid 
28.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
10.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2019Fee for grant paid
08.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLT18.09.2019
NO18.12.2019
[2020/08]
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2010278119  (POTKONJAK MIODRAG [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,13-15 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0 51] , [0 54] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0062] - [0 66] * * figures 1,2, 9 * [Y] 10 [I] 3,5,11,12;
 [Y]WO2008111684  (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * page 11, line 4 - page 14, line 22 *;
 [A]WO2008044877  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1,13-15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] * * figure 1 *
International search[Y]JP2009170981  (NTT DOCOMO INC);
 [Y]JP2008288973  (SONY CORP);
 [A]JP2002199438  (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC)
ExaminationWO2011121170
by applicantJP2010193456