Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2891946

EP2891946 - INTERACTION METHOD AND INTERACTION DEVICE FOR INTEGRATING AUGMENTED REALITY TECHNOLOGY AND BULK DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.10.2016
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jo, Geun Sik
No. 601/1302
10, Haedoji-ro 84beon-gil
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 21996 / KR
[2016/22]
Former [2015/28]For all designated states
Inha-Industry Partnership Institute
253 Yonghyeon-dong
Nam-gu
Incheon 402-751 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JO, Geun Sik
No. 601/1302
10, Haedoji-ro 84beon-gil
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 21996 / KR
02 / LEE, Kee Sung
No. 101-602 Line Apt.
Oryu-dong
Guro-gu
Seoul 152- 100 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2015/28]01 / JO, Geun Sik
No. 601-1302 Pungrim I-one
Songdo-dong
Yeonsu-gu
Incheon 406-731 / KR
02 / LEE, Kee Sung
No. 101-602 Line Apt.
Oryu-dong
Guro-gu
Seoul 152- 100 / KR
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
Medina Chambers
Town Quay
Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/28]Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date13833994.005.07.2013
WO2013KR06014
Priority number, dateKR2012009448428.08.2012         Original published format: KR 20120094484
[2015/28]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014035041
Date:06.03.2014
Language:KO
[2014/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2891946
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/00, G06F17/00
[2015/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/28]
TitleGerman:INTERAKTIONSVERFAHREN UND INTERAKTIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUR INTEGRATION VON AUGMENTED-REALITY-TECHNOLOGIE UND MASSENDATEN[2015/28]
English:INTERACTION METHOD AND INTERACTION DEVICE FOR INTEGRATING AUGMENTED REALITY TECHNOLOGY AND BULK DATA[2015/28]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'INTERACTION ET DISPOSITIF D'INTERACTION PERMETTANT D'INTÉGRER LA TECHNOLOGIE DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE ET DES DONNÉES EN MASSE[2015/28]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2015Translation filed 
19.02.2015National basic fee paid 
19.02.2015Search fee paid 
19.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
10.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.10.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination20.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0758/18
12.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009322671  (SCOTT KATHERINE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-10,13 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 5,6,11,12
International search[A]JP2000155773  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD);
 [A]JP2007018517  (FUJITSU LTD)
 [Y]  - KIM, EUN-YOUNG ET AL., "A Realtime Music Editing and Playback System in An Augmented Reality Environments", JOURNAL OF THE KOREA SOCIETY OF COMPUTER AND INFORMATION, (20110701), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 79 - 88, XP008176343

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.9708/jksci.2011.16.6.079
 [Y]  - LIAROKAPIS, F., "Augmented Reality Scenarios for Guitar Learning", PROC. OF THE EG UK THEORY AND PRACTICE OFCOMP. GRAPHICS, (2005), pages 163 - 170, XP055190592