blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2883909

EP2883909 - RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TIRES, TIRE MEMBER, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2024New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd.
6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / KOJIMA Ryoji
c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD.
6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP
02 / YOKOYAMA Yuka
c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD.
6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP
03 / YOSHINO Masafumi
c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD.
6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/45]Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Former [2015/25]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13834844.606.09.2013
[2017/45]
WO2013JP74015
Priority number, dateJP2012019750207.09.2012         Original published format: JP 2012197502
[2015/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014038647
Date:13.03.2014
Language:JA
[2014/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2883909
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2883909
Date:08.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2016
ClassificationIPC:C08L9/06, B60C1/00, C08F236/06, C12P5/00, C12P5/02, C12P7/16, C08F236/10, // C08F212/08
[2016/24]
CPC:
C08L9/06 (EP,CN,US); C08F236/10 (US); B60C1/00 (EP,CN,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,CN,US); C07C11/167 (US); C08F236/06 (CN,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US); C08K3/36 (EP,US); C08K5/548 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,CN,US); C12P5/005 (EP,CN,US); C12P5/026 (EP,CN,US);
C08F212/08 (EP,US); C08L2205/02 (CN); C08L2205/025 (CN);
C08L2205/035 (CN) (-)
C-Set:
C08F236/06, C08F212/08 (CN);
C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K5/548 (EP,US);
C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08K13/02, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K2003/2296, C08K5/09, C08K3/06 (CN);
C08L9/06, C08L7/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K5/548 (US,EP);
C08L9/06, C08L7/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08K13/02, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08K2003/2296, C08K5/09, C08K3/06 (CN)
(-)
Former IPC [2015/25]C08L9/06, B60C1/00, C08F212/08, C08F236/06, C12P5/00, C12P5/02, C12P7/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR REIFEN, REIFENELEMENT UND LUFTREIFEN[2015/25]
English:RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TIRES, TIRE MEMBER, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE[2015/25]
French:COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC POUR PNEUMATIQUE, ÉLÉMENT DE PNEUMATIQUE, ET PNEUMATIQUE[2015/25]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2015Translation filed 
12.03.2015National basic fee paid 
12.03.2015Search fee paid 
12.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
10.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2017Fee for grant paid
27.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2017
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.07.2018  20.07.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
23 place des Carmes-Déchaux
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
Opponent's representative
M.F.P. Michelin
DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23 place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
 [2023/47]
Former [2018/44]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2018  20.07.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
23 place des Carmes-Déchaux
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
Opponent's representative
Le Cam, Véronique Marie Christine
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
Former [2018/34]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2018   
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
12 Cours Sablon
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
Opponent's representative
Le Cam, Véronique Marie Christine
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
21.08.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.12.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
19.03.2020Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.03.2020Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.01.2024Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2024Reply to a communication from the opposition division
Appeal following opposition15.05.2020Appeal received No.  T1249/20
09.07.2020Statement of grounds filed
23.06.2023Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
05.09.2023Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
23.06.2023Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.09.2013
AL08.11.2017
AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
MK08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
PT08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
TR08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
GB06.09.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
MT06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
[2020/34]
Former [2020/31]HU06.09.2013
AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
MK08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
PT08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
TR08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
GB06.09.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
MT06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2020/28]HU06.09.2013
AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
PT08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
TR08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
GB06.09.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
MT06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2020/16]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
TR08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
GB06.09.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
MT06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2020/08]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
GB06.09.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
MT06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2019/47]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
GB06.09.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2019/40]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2019/38]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
Former [2019/33]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
IE06.09.2018
LU06.09.2018
Former [2019/30]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
LU06.09.2018
Former [2019/24]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MC08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
IT08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT08.11.2017
CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
DK08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SE08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
NO08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES08.11.2017
FI08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
NL08.11.2017
NO08.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012021478  (OSTERHOUT ROBIN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0353] *;
 [A]  - GROENEWOUD W M ED - GROENEWOUD W M, Passage, CHARACTERISATION OF POLYMERS BY THERMAL ANALYSIS, ELSEVIER, NL, PAGE(S) 16 - 25, (20010101), ISBN 0-444-50604-7, XP008180097 [A] 1-15 * page 17, paragraph 1.2.1 *
 [A]  - MUKAI N ET AL, "PAD1 and FDC1 are essential for the decarboxylation of phenylacrylic acids in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 109, no. 6, ISSN 1389-1723, (20100601), pages 564 - 569, (20091216), XP027051720 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - KATRIN JULIANE SCHWARZ ET AL, "Enzymatic formation of styrene during wheat beer feentation is dependent on pitching rate and cinnamic acid content", vol. 118, no. 3, doi:10.1002/JIB.41, ISSN 0046-9750, (20120301), pages 280 - 284, JOURNAL OF THE INSTITUTE OF BREWING, INSTITUTE OF BREWING. LONDON, GB, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/jib.41/pdf, (20121025), XP002729250 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/JIB.41
International search[X]WO2010099201  (GEVO INC [US], et al);
 [X]WO2011085223  (GEVO INC [US], et al);
 [X]JP2012153654  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND)
by applicantJPS60115532
 JPS62285779
 JP2003063206
 JP2004306011
 JP2010508017
 JP2010115116
 JP2011522563
 JP2011526489
    - SYU M.J., APPL. MICROBIAL BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 55, pages 10 - 18
    - QIN ET AL., CHINESE J. CHEM. ENG., (2006), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 132 - 136
    - SONI ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1987), vol. 27, pages 1 - 5
    - "Butadiene", KIRSHENBAUM, I., Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1978), vol. 4, pages 313 - 337
    - GAMBORG O.L.; MILLER R. A.; OJIMA K., EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, (1968), vol. 50, pages 151 - 158
OppositionWO2010053950
 WO2010099201
 WO2011085223
 JP2011148720
 WO2012018624
 JP2012153654
    - REBEKAH MCKENNA et al., "Styrene biosynthesis from glucose by engineered E.coli", Metabolic Engineering, (20110000), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 544 - 554, XP028274822

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2011.06.005
    - KATRIN JULIAN SCHWARZ et al., "Enzymatic formation of styrene during wheat beer fermentation is dépendent on pitching rate and cinnamic acid content", JOURNAL OF THE INSTITUTE OF BREWING, London, GB, (20120331), vol. 118, pages 280 - 284, XP055414885

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jib.41
    - XAVIER FERNANDEZ et al., "Chemical composition of the essential oils from Turkish and Honduras Styrax", Flavour and Fragrance Journal, (20050000), vol. 20, pages 70 - 73, XP055512934

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ffj.1370
    - W.M. Groenewoud, Characterization of Polymers by Thermal Analysis, (20010000), pages 17 - 25, ISBN 0-444-50604-7, XP055512942
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.