EP2893061 - METHODS FOR DISCOVERING THERAPEUTIC TARGETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arizona Board of Regents, a Body Corporate of the State of Arizona acting for and on behalf of Arizona State University 1475 North Scottsdale Road Skysong Suite 200 Scottsdale, AZ 85257-9908 / US | [2018/51] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Arizona Board of Regents, a Body Corporate of the State of Arizona acting for and on behalf of Arizona State University 1475 North Scottsdale Road Sky Song Suite 200 Scottsdale, US 85257 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSTON, Stephen, Albert 8606 South Dorsey Lane Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | 02 /
LEGUTKI, Joseph, Barten 1475 North Scottsdale Road Skysong Suite 200 Scottsdale, AZ 85257-9908 / US | 03 /
KUKREJA, Muskan 445 Ribbon Beach Way Apt. 278 Oceanside, CA 92058 / US | [2015/43] |
Former [2015/29] | 01 /
JOHNSTON, Stephen, Albert 8606 South Dorsey Lane Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | ||
02 /
LEGUTKI, Joseph, Barten 1475 North Scottsdale Road Skysong Suite 200 Scottsdale, AZ 85257-9908 / US | |||
03 /
KUKREJA, Muskan 1475 North Scottsdale Road Skysong Suite 200 Scottsdale, AZ 85257-9908 / US | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [2019/21] |
Former [2015/29] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13834985.7 | 05.09.2013 | [2019/21] | WO2013US58325 | Priority number, date | US201261696873P | 05.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261696873 P | US201314014168 | 29.08.2013 Original published format: US201314014168 | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014039718 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893061 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2893061 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C40B30/04 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
G01N33/6854 (EP,CN,GB);
G01N33/6845 (EP,CN,GB,US);
C40B30/04 (GB);
C07K1/047 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US);
G01N2800/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTDECKUNG THERAPEUTISCHER ZIELMOLEKÜLE | [2015/29] | English: | METHODS FOR DISCOVERING THERAPEUTIC TARGETS | [2015/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉCOUVERTE DE CIBLES THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2018 | 19.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19175462.1 / EP3604634 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2013 | AL | 22.05.2019 | AT | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | CZ | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | ES | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | IT | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | NL | 22.05.2019 | PL | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | RS | 22.05.2019 | SE | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | SM | 22.05.2019 | TR | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | NO | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IE | 05.09.2019 | LU | 05.09.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | PT | 22.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.09.2013 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.09.2013 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008151146 (DIGITAB INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * par.29, 373; claims 6, 13 *; | [X] - R. F. HALPERIN ET AL, "Exploring Antibody Recognition of Sequence Space through Random-Sequence Peptide Microarrays", MOLECULAR & CELLULAR PROTEOMICS, (20110301), vol. 10, no. 3, doi:10.1074/mcp.M110.000786, ISSN 1535-9476, XP055261904 [X] 1-15 * p.1 last par. - p.2; figure 1; discussion last column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/mcp.M110.000786 | [X] - CHEN GUOAN ET AL, "Autoantibody profiles reveal ubiquilin 1 as a humoral immune response target in lung adenocarcinoma", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20070401), vol. 67, no. 7, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-4475, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3461 - 3467, XP002613601 [X] 1-15 * abstract; discussion last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-4475 | [X] - MICHAEL HECKER ET AL, "Computational analysis of high-density peptide microarray data with application from systemic sclerosis to multiple sclerosis", AUTOIMMUNITY REVIEWS, vol. 11, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.AUTREV.2011.05.010, ISSN 1568-9972, (20120101), pages 180 - 190, (20110518), XP028445112 [X] 1-15 * abstract; p.9 col.1 par.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.autrev.2011.05.010 | International search | [A]US2009176664 (CHU KETING [US]); | [A]US2011143953 (JOHNSTON STEPHEN A [US], et al); | [X]US2012190574 (JOHNSTON STEPHEN ALBERT [US], et al) | by applicant | US2012190574 | - HANASH, S., "Disease proteomics", Nature, (20030000), vol. 422, doi:doi:10.1038/nature01514, pages 226 - 232, XP002337600 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature01514 | - REDDY, M.M. et al., "Identification of Candidate IgG Biomarkers for Alzheimer's Disease via Combinatorial Library Screening", Cell, vol. 144, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2010.11.054, pages 132 - 142, XP028151095 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2010.11.054 | - PANICKER, R.C. et al., "Recent advances in peptide-based microarray technologies", Comb Chem High Throughput Screen, (20040000), vol. 7, pages 547 - 556 | - FU, J. et al., "Exploring peptide space for enzyme modulators", J Am Chem Soc, (20100000), vol. 132, pages 6419 - 6424 | - FU, J. et al., "Peptide-modified surfaces for enzyme immobilization", PLoS One, (20110000), vol. 6, page e18692 | - DIEHNELT, C.W. et al., "Discovery of high-affinity protein binding ligands-backwards", PLoS One, vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0010728, page e10728, XP055052323 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0010728 | - GREVING, M.P. et al., "High-throughput screening in two dimensions: binding intensity and off-rate on a peptide microarray", Anal Biochem, vol. 402, pages 93 - 95 | - GREVING, M.P. et al., "Thermodynamic additivity of sequence variations: an algorithm for creating high affinity peptides without large libraries or structural information", PLoS One, vol. 5, page e15432 | - GUPTA, N. et al., "Engineering a synthetic ligand for tumor necrosis factor-alpha", Bioconjug Chem, vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1021/bc200091c, pages 1473 - 1478, XP055052318 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc200091c | - BOLTZ, K.W. et al., "Peptide microarrays for carbohydrate recognition", Analyst, (20090000), vol. 134, doi:doi:10.1039/b823156g, pages 650 - 652, XP009120846 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b823156g | - FOONG, Y.M. et al., "Current advances in peptide and small molecule microarray technologies", Curr Opin Chem Biol, (20120000), vol. 16, pages 234 - 242 | - MORALES BETANZOS, C. et al., "Bacterial glycoprofiling by using random sequence peptide microarrays", Chembiochem, (20090000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1002/cbic.200800716, pages 877 - 888, XP055051159 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200800716 | - FALSEY, J.R. et al., "Peptide and small molecule microarray for high throughput cell adhesion and functional assays", Bioconjug Chem, (20010000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1021/bc000141q, pages 346 - 353, XP001145929 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc000141q | - CERECEDO, I. et al., "Mapping of the IgE and IgG4 sequential epitopes of milk allergens with a peptide microarray-based immunoassay", J Allergy Clin Immunol, (20080000), vol. 122, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jaci.2008.06.040, pages 589 - 594, XP024519626 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2008.06.040 | - CRETICH, M. et al., "Epitope mapping of human chromogranin A by peptide microarrays", Methods Mol Biol, (20090000), vol. 570, pages 221 - 232 | - LIN, J. et al., "Development of a novel peptide microarray for large-scale epitope mapping of food allergens", J Allergy Clin Immunol, (20090000), vol. 124, pages 315 - 322,322 e311-313 | - LORENZ, P. et al., "Probing the epitope signatures of IgG antibodies in human serum from patients with autoimmune disease", Methods Mol Biol, (20090000), vol. 524, doi:doi:10.1007/978-1-59745-450-6_18, pages 247 - 258, XP009138991 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-59745-450-6_18 | - PEREZ-GORDO, M. et al., "Epitope mapping of Atlantic salmon major allergen by peptide microarray immunoassay", Int. Arch Allergy Immunol, (20120000), vol. 157, pages 31 - 40 | - SHREFFLER, W.G. et al., "IgE and IgG4 epitope mapping by microarray immunoassay reveals the diversity of immune response to the peanut allergen, Ara h 2", J Allergy Clin Immunol, (20050000), vol. 116, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jaci.2005.06.033, pages 893 - 899, XP005094484 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2005.06.033 | - MOHAN, S. et al., "Association energetics of cross-reactive and specific antibodies", Biochemistry, (20090000), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1021/BI801901D, pages 1390 - 1398, XP002556431 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BI801901D | - THORPE, I.F.; BROOKS, C.L., 3RD, "Molecular evolution of affinity and flexibility in the immune system", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20070000), vol. 104, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0610064104, pages 8821 - 8826, XP055069476 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0610064104 | - ZHOU, Z.H. et al., "Properties and function of polyreactive antibodies and polyreactive antigen-binding B cells", J Autoimmun, (20070000), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jaut.2007.07.015, pages 219 - 228, XP022317186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaut.2007.07.015 | - FOLGORI, A. et al., "A general strategy to identify mimotopes of pathological antigens using only random peptide libraries and human sera", Embo J, (19940000), vol. 13, pages 2236 - 2243, XP000441903 | - CHRISTIAN, R.B. et al., "Simplified methods for construction, assessment and rapid screening of peptide libraries in bacteriophage", Journal of Molecular Biology, (19920000), vol. 227, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(92)90219-A, pages 711 - 718, XP024020603 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(92)90219-A | - LIU, R. et al., "Combinatorial peptide library methods for immunobiology research", Experimental Hematology, (20030000), vol. 31, pages 11 - 30 | - WANG, Y. et al., "Detection of Mammary Tumor Virus ENV Gene-like Sequences in Human Breast Cancer", Cancer Research, (19950000), vol. 55, pages 5173 - 5179, XP001008892 | - DERDA, R. et al., "Diversity of phage-displayed libraries of peptides during panning and amplification", Molecules, (20110000), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.3390/molecules16021776, pages 1776 - 1803, XP009157587 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules16021776 | - SZARDENINGS, M., "Phage display of random peptide libraries: applications, limits, and potential", J Recept Signal Transduct Res, (20030000), vol. 23, pages 307 - 34953 | - NOBREGA, A. et al., "Functional diversity and clonal frequencies of reactivity in the available antibody repertoire", European Journal of Immunology, (19980000), vol. 28, pages 1204 - 1215 | - BROWN, J.R. et al., "Statistical methods for analyzing immunosignatures", BMC Bioinformatics, (20110000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2105-12-349, page 349, XP021108665 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-12-349 | - HUGHES, A.K. et al., "Immunosignaturing can detect products from molecular markers in brain cancer", PLoS One, (20120000), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0040201, page e40201, XP055261866 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0040201 | - KROENING, K. et al., "Autoreactive antibodies raised by self derived de novo peptides can identify unrelated antigens on protein microarrays. Are autoantibodies really autoantibodies?", Exp Mol Pathol, (20120000), vol. 92, doi:doi:10.1016/j.yexmp.2012.03.002, pages 304 - 311, XP028423893 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexmp.2012.03.002 | - KUKREJA, M. et al., "Comparative study of classification algorithms for immunosignaturing data", BMC Bioinformatics, (20120000), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2105-13-139, page 139, XP021132325 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-13-139 | - LEGUTKI, J.B. et al., "A general method for characterization of humoral immunity induced by a vaccine or infection", Vaccine, (20100000), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.04.061, pages 4529 - 4537, XP027078073 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.04.061 | - STAFFORD, P.; JOHNSTON, S., "Microarray technology displays the complexities of the humoral immune response", Expert Rev Mol Diagn, (20110000), vol. 11, pages 5 - 8 | - HALPERIN, R.F. et al., "Exploring Antibody Recognition of Sequence Space through Random-Sequence Peptide Microarrays", Molecular & Cellular Proteomics, (20110000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1074/mcp.M110.000786, XP055261904 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/mcp.M110.000786 | - STAFFORD, P.; JOHNSTON, S., "Microarray technology displays the complexities of the humoral immune response", Expert Rev Mol Diagn, (20110000), vol. 11 | - STAFFORD, P. et al., "Physical characterization of the ''immunosignaturing effect", Mol Cell Proteomics, (20120000), vol. 11, page Ml 11 011593 | - CHASE, B.A. et al., "Evaluation of biological sample preparation for immunosignature-based diagnostics", Clin Vaccine Immunol, (20120000), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1128/CVI.05667-11, pages 352 - 358, XP055261902 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.05667-11 | - RESTREPO, L. et al., "Application of immunosignatures to the assessment of Alzheimer's disease", Annals of Neurology, (20110000), vol. 70, doi:doi:10.1002/ana.22405, pages 286 - 295, XP055261912 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.22405 | - UHLEN, M.; HOBER, S., "Generation and validation of affinity reagents on a proteome-wide level", J Mol Recognit, (20090000), vol. 22, pages 57 - 64 | - YANG, Y. et al., "Segmentation and intensity estimation for microarray images with saturated pixels", BMC Bioinformatics, (20110000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2105-12-462, page 462, XP021130391 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-12-462 | - HUGHES, A.K. et al., "Immunosignaturing can detect products from molecular markers in brain cancer", PLoS One, vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0040201, page e40201, XP055261866 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0040201 | - B. W. JAGGER et al., Science, (20120713), vol. 337, page 199 9 | - J. B. LEGUTKI; D. M. MAGEE; P. STAFFORD; S. A. JOHNSTON, Vaccine, (20100505), vol. 28, page 4529 | - R. F. HALPERIN; P. STAFFORD; J. S. EMERY; K. A. NAVALKAR; S. A. JOHNSTON, BMC Bioinformatics, (20120000), vol. 13, page 1 | - B. A. CHASE; S. A. JOHNSTON; J. B. LEGUTKI, Clin Vaccine Immunol, (20120300), vol. 19, page 352 |