Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2894064

EP2894064 - ROTARY ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATOR AND CAR LAMP LOW BEAM AND HIGH BEAM SWITCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/29]ROTARY ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATING MECHANISM AND CAR LAMP UPPER AND LOWER BEAM SWITCHING APPARATUS THEREOF
[2019/40]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.09.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shanghai Koito Automotive Lamp Co., Ltd.
767 Yecheng Road Jiading
Shanghai 201821 / CN
[2015/29]
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Shijie
767 Yecheng Road
Jiading
Shanghai 201821 / CN
02 / ZHU, Minghua
767 Yecheng Road
Jiading
Shanghai 201821 / CN
03 / GUO, Tianzhong
767 Yecheng Road
Jiading
Shanghai 201821 / CN
04 / CHEN, Yujie
767 Yecheng Road
Jiading
Shanghai 201821 / CN
 [2015/29]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/29]Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date13835120.005.09.2013
WO2013CN82970
Priority number, dateCN20121033072807.09.2012         Original published format: CN201210330728
[2015/29]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014036948
Date:13.03.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2894064
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN13.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:F21S41/689
[2019/40]
Former International [2016/21]F21S8/10, F21V14/08
Former International [2015/29]B60Q1/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER DREHANTRIEB SOWIE ABBLENDLICHT- UND FERNLICHTUMSCHALTVORRICHTUNG EINER FAHRZEUGLEUCHTE[2019/40]
English:ROTARY ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATOR AND CAR LAMP LOW BEAM AND HIGH BEAM SWITCHING DEVICE[2019/40]
French:ACTUATEUR ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE ROTATIF ET APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION DE FEUX DE CROISEMENT ET FEUX DE ROUTE D'UNE LAMPE DE VOITURE[2019/40]
Former [2015/29]ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER DREHBETÄTIGUNGSMECHANISMUS SOWIE OBER- UND UNTERSTRAHLUMSCHALTUNG EINES FAHRZEUGSCHEINWERFERS DAFÜR
Former [2015/29]ROTARY ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATING MECHANISM AND CAR LAMP UPPER AND LOWER BEAM SWITCHING APPARATUS THEREOF
Former [2015/29]MÉCANISME D'ACTIONNEMENT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE ROTATIF ET SON APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION DE FAISCEAU SUPÉRIEURE ET INFÉRIEURE DE LAMPE DE VOITURE
Entry into regional phase24.03.2015Translation filed 
24.03.2015National basic fee paid 
24.03.2015Search fee paid 
24.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
11.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2008035385  (SO GE MI SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * page 2, line 30 - page 6; figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]EP2442017  (MES SA [CH]) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * paragraphs [0018] - [0040]; figures 1-7 *;
 [YA]JP2002056707  (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0016] - [0021]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,2,4;
 [A]JP2011239532  (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0040] - [0072]; figures 1-6 *
International search[XP]CN102848969  (SHANGHAI KOITO AUTOMOTIVE LAMP CO., LTD.);
 [XP]CN202728068U  (SHANGHAI KOITO AUTOMOTIVE LAMP CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN201180925Y  (DIBAO IND CO., LTD.);
 [A]US5339226  (ISHIKAWA);
 [A]CN101666453  (SHANGHAI ELECTRIC CERAMIC PLANT CO., LTD.)
by applicantCN201089421Y