Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2893447

EP2893447 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED MEMORY AND THREAD EXECUTION ANOMALY DETECTION IN A COMPUTER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Triumfant, Inc.
79 TW Alexander Drive 4401 Research Commons, Suite 205
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
[2015/29]
Inventor(s)01 / QUINN, Mitchell, N.
5301 Harrington Grove Dr.
Raleigh, NC 27613 / US
 [2015/29]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/29]
Application number, filing date13835850.221.08.2013
[2019/46]
WO2013US55912
Priority number, dateUS20121360544506.09.2012         Original published format: US201213605445
[2015/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014039257
Date:13.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2893447
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014
[2015/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2893447
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/07
[2016/16]
Former International [2015/29]G06F11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN ANOMALIEDETEKTION IN EINER SPEICHER- UND THREAD-AUSFÜHRUNG IN EINEM COMPUTERNETZWERK[2015/29]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED MEMORY AND THREAD EXECUTION ANOMALY DETECTION IN A COMPUTER NETWORK[2015/29]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION AUTOMATIQUE D'ANOMALIE DE MÉMOIRE ET D'EXÉCUTION DE FIL DANS UN RÉSEAU INFORMATIQUE[2015/29]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2015National basic fee paid 
16.03.2015Search fee paid 
16.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
14.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2019Fee for grant paid
30.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1628222  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0021] - [0023] - [0052] - [0062] - [0079] - [0083] - [0088] * * figures 1-12 *;
 [XI]US2012102359  (HOOKS DAVID EUGENE [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0088] - [0107] - [0110] * * claims 1,5 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4,6,11,12,15;
 [I]  - HENRY HANPING FENG ET AL, "Anomaly detection using call stack information", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON SECURITY AND PRIVACY. S&P 2003. BERKELEY, CA, MAY 11 - 14, 2003; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON SECURITY AND PRIVACY], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20030511), ISBN 978-0-7695-1940-1, pages 62 - 75, XP010639713 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2012102359  (HOOKS DAVID EUGENE [US]);
 [Y]US2011099633  (AZIZ ASHAR [US]);
 [Y]US2010017879  (KUEGLER RUEDIGER [DE], et al);
 [Y]US2011047621  (BRANDO DANNY [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010023810  (STOLFO SALVATORE J [US], et al);
 [A]US2011185430  (SALLAM AHMED SAID [US]);
 [A]US2005120239  (MONROE KLAYTON [US], et al);
 [A]US2008109730  (COFFMAN THAYNE RICHARD [US], et al);
 [A]US2012079596  (THOMAS RALPH [US], et al)
by applicantEP1628222
 US2012102359
    - FENG et al., Anomaly Detection Using Call Stack Information