Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2893430

EP2893430 - SYNCHRONIZING MULTIPLE READING POSITIONS IN ELECTRONIC BOOKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/41]
Former [2017/45]For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2015/29]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PUPPIN, Diego
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2015/29]
Representative(s)Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/41]
Former [2015/29]Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13835903.923.08.2013
[2019/41]
WO2013US56337
Priority number, dateUS20121360457505.09.2012         Original published format: US201213604575
[2015/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014039286
Date:13.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2893430
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014
[2015/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2893430
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F16/93, G06F16/27, G06F16/957
[2019/15]
Former International [2015/35]G06F3/14, G06F9/52, G06F3/048, G06F17/30
Former International [2015/29]G06F3/14, G06F9/52, G06F3/048
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYNCHRONISIERUNG MEHRERER LESEPOSITIONEN BEI ELEKTRONISCHEN BÜCHERN[2015/29]
English:SYNCHRONIZING MULTIPLE READING POSITIONS IN ELECTRONIC BOOKS[2015/29]
French:SYNCHRONISATION DE POSITIONS MULTIPLES DE LECTURE DE LIVRES ÉLECTRONIQUES[2015/29]
Entry into regional phase24.03.2015National basic fee paid 
24.03.2015Search fee paid 
24.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
12.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2019Fee for grant paid
22.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011231474  (LOCKER HOWARD [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 3,5 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0038] *
International search[X]US2011106970  (SONG MYOUNG-JONG [KR], et al);
 [Y]WO2012115853  (GOOGLE INC [US], et al);
 [A]US7748634  (ZEHR GREGG [US], et al);
 [A]WO2007099529  (SANDISK IL LTD [IL], et al);
 [A]US2012221968  (PATTERSON JAMES [US], et al)