Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2892529

EP2892529 - USES OF (-)-PERHEXILINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.09.2018  [2018/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adelaide Research&Innovation Pty Ltd
Level 14, 115 Grenfell Street
Adelaide, South Australia 5000 / AU
For all designated states
Central Adelaide Local Health Network Inc
11 Hindmarsh Square
Adelaide, South Australia 5000 / AU
For all designated states
Itek Ventures Pty Ltd
PO Box 546
Salisbury South, South Australia 5106 / AU
[2015/29]
Inventor(s)01 / SALLUSTIO, Benedetta
33 Benjamin Street
Manningham South Australia 5086 / AU
02 / MILNE, Robert
40 Adelaide Street
Maylands South Australia 5069 / AU
03 / LICARI, John
7 Huron Grove
West Lakes South Australia 5021 / AU
04 / SOMOGYI, Andrew Alexander
51 Prosperity Way
Athelstone South Australia 5076 / AU
 [2015/29]
Representative(s)Gill, Siân Victoria , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/29]Murphy, Colm Damien
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13836009.405.09.2013
WO2013AU01008
Priority number, dateAU2012090385005.09.2012         Original published format: AU 2012903850
US201261697214P05.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261697214 P
[2015/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014036603
Date:13.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2892529
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014
[2015/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU13.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/445, A61P9/10, A61P9/04, A61P43/00
[2016/03]
Former International [2015/29]A61K31/445, A61P9/10, A61P9/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNGEN VON (-)-PERHEXILIN[2015/29]
English:USES OF (-)-PERHEXILINE[2015/29]
French:UTILISATIONS DE (-)-PERHEXILINE[2015/29]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2015National basic fee paid 
30.03.2015Search fee paid 
30.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
20.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/39]
07.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2010131033  (HEART METABOLICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 abstract , p. 1 , l. 20 - l. 22 , p. 2 - p. 3 , l. 20 - l. 11 , p. 4 , l. 10 - l. 12 , ex. 1 , cl. 1-8
 [X]WO2010133815  (HEART METABOLICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 abstract , p. 1 , l. 2 - l. 3 , p. 1 , l. 25 - l. 27 , p. 2 - p. 3 , l. 23 - l. 22 , p. 3 - p. 4 , l. 24 - l. 5 , ex. 1 , cl. 1-7
 [X]WO2009066085  (HEART METABOLICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 abstract , p. 1 , l. 22 - l. 27 , p. 1 - p. 3 , l. 28 - l. 9 , ex. 1,2 , cl. 1-7
 [X]WO2005087233  (HEART METABOLICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 abstract , p. 1 , l. 3 - l. 5 , p. 6 - p. 8 , l. 14 - l. 8 , ex. 1 , cl. 1-15
 [X]WO2014184561  (UNIV ABERDEEN [GB]) [X] 1-11 abstract , p. 1 , l. 11 - l. 22 , p. 2 - p. 3 , l. 15 - l. 10 , p. 4 , l. 21 - l. 24 , p. 4 - p. 7 , l. 26 - l. 25 ;* pages 96-102, Biological Study * , cl. 1-55
 [X]  K. ABOZGUIA ET AL, "Metabolic Modulator Perhexiline Corrects Energy Deficiency and Improves Exercise Capacity in Symptomatic Hypertrophic Cardiomyopathy", CIRCULATION, US, (20101019), vol. 122, no. 16, doi:10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.109.934059, ISSN 0009-7322, PAGE 1562 - 1569, XP055236402 [X] 1-11 the whole document

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.109.934059
International search[X]WO2007096251  (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT], et al);
 [X]  - GOULD B.J. ET AL., "Stereoselective pharmacokinetics of perhexiline", XENOBIOTICA, (1986), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 491 - 502,
 [A]  - MORROW D.A. ET AL., "Modulation of Myocardial Energetics: Emerging Evidence for a Therapeutic Target in Cardiovascular Disease", CIRCULATION, (2005), vol. 112, no. 21, pages 3218 - 3221,
 [A]  - ASHRAFIAN H. ET AL., "Perhexiline", CARDIOVASCULAR DRUG REVIEWS, (2007), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 76 - 97, XP055234677

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1527-3466.2007.00006.x
 [A]  - LEE L. ET AL., "Metabolic Modulation With Perhexiline in Chronic Heart Failure: A Randomized, Controlled Trial of Short-Term Use of a Novel Treatment", CIRCULATION, (2005), vol. 112, no. 21, pages 3280 - 3288,
 [A]  - CECCARELLI S.M. ET AL., "Carnitine Palmitoyltransferase (CPT) Modulators: A Medicinal Chemistry Perspective on 35 Years of Research", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20110512), vol. 54, no. 9, pages 3109 - 3152, XP055234685

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm100809g
 [A]  - DAVIES B.J. ET AL., "CYP2B6, CYP2D6, and CYP3A4 Catalyze the Primary Oxidative Metabolism of Perhexiline Enantiomers by Human Liver Microsomes", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, (2007), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 128 - 138, XP055234691

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/dmd.106.012252
 [A]  - DAVIES B.J. ET AL., "Steady-state pharmacokinetics of the enantiomers of perhexiline in CYP2D6 poor and extensive metabolizers administered Rac-perhexiline", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2007), vol. 65, no. 3, pages 347 - 354, XP055234696

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2125.2007.03015.x
 [A]  - INGLIS S.C. ET AL., "Effect of CYP2D6 metabolizer status on the disposition of the (+) and (-) enantiomers of perhexiline in patients with myocardial ischaemia", PHARMACOGENETICS AND GENOMICS, (200705), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 305 - 312,
 [A]  - NATIONAL HEART FOUNDATION OF AUSTRALIA AND THE CARDIAC SOCIETY OF AUSTRALIA AND NEW ZEALAND, "Guidelines for the prevention, detection and management of chronic heart failure in Australia", CHRONIC HEART FAILURE GUIDELINES EXPERT WRITING PANEL., (201110),
 [A]  - POGATSA G ET AL., "Metabolic energy metabolism in diabetes: therapeutic implications", CORONARY ARTERY DISEASE, (200102), vol. 12, no. SUPP.1, pages S29 - S33,