Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2896399

EP2896399 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING CYCLOPHILIN A FOR PREVENTING ALOPECIA OR IMPROVING HAIR RESTORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University-Industry Cooperation Group of Kyung Hee University
Global Campus
1732 Deogyeong-daero
Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 446-701 / KR
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / CHOE, Wonchae
101-202
60 Samgae-ro
Yongsan-gu
Seoul 140-050 / KR
 [2015/41]
Former [2015/30]01 / CHOE, Wonchae
101-202
60 Samgae-ro
Yongsan-gu
Seoul 140-050 / KR
02 / KIM, Kiyoon
810-402
28 Cheongam-ro
Paju-si Gyeonggi-do 413-110 / KR
03 / JO, Yunhee
304
65 Seungbang-gil
Gwanak-gu
Seoul 151-801 / KR
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/52]
Former [2015/30]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13837042.410.09.2013
[2017/52]
WO2013KR08164
Priority number, dateKR2012010105312.09.2012         Original published format: KR 20120101053
[2015/30]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014042401
Date:20.03.2014
Language:KO
[2014/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2896399
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2896399
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, A61K38/16, A61K48/00, A61P17/14, A61Q5/00, A61K8/64, A61K8/66, A61Q7/00, G01N33/50, A61K8/60, A61K38/52
[2016/12]
Former International [2015/30]A61K38/17, A61K38/16, A61K48/00, A61P17/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT CYCLOPHILIN-A ZUR VORBEUGUNG VON ALOPEZIE ODER FÜR VERBESSERTE WIEDERHERSTELLUNG VON HAAREN[2015/30]
English:COMPOSITION COMPRISING CYCLOPHILIN A FOR PREVENTING ALOPECIA OR IMPROVING HAIR RESTORATION[2015/30]
French:COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DE LA CYCLOPHILINE A DE PRÉVENTION CONTRE L'ALOPÉCIE OU D'AMÉLIORATION DE RÉGÉNÉRATION DU SYSTÈME PILEUX[2015/30]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2015Translation filed 
25.03.2015National basic fee paid 
25.03.2015Search fee paid 
25.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
01.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2017Fee for grant paid
14.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2017
Opposition(s)28.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE10.09.2018
LU10.09.2018
MT10.09.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/33]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE10.09.2018
LU10.09.2018
Former [2019/30]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
LU10.09.2018
Former [2019/24]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2019/13]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/39]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/25]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006084333  (AUSTRALIAN NEUROMUSCULAR RES I [AU], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 25 - page 29 * * page 30 - page 36 *;
 [X]WO2010054141  (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * sequence 3 * * claims *;
 [Y]DE102009043486  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 6 * table 1 * * paragraph [0115] * * claims 14-20 * * examples 2-5 *;
 [A]US2002165275  (WU YONG-QIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * example 15 * * paragraph [0065]; example 23; claim 20 *;
 [Y]US2003055009  (STEINER JOSEPH P [US], et al) [Y] 6 * page 10 *
International search[A]JPH11174041  (SHISEIDO CO LTD);
 [A]US2010041747  (FISCHER GUNTER [DE], et al);
 [A]KR100641295B  (KIM, SUNG-SOO)
 [A]  - MOSCOSO-SOLORZANO ET AL., "Cyclophilin A as a mediator of tissue injure and nephrotoxicity", NEPHROLOGY REVIEWS, (20120717), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 42 - 44, XP055242925

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4081/nr.2012.e9
 [A]  - SOLASSOL ET AL., "FKBP family proteins as promising new biomarkers for cancer", CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY, (2011), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 320 - 325, XP028259805

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coph.2011.03.012
 [A]  - CIESEK ET AL., "Cyclosporine A inhibits hepatitis C virus nonstructural protein 2 through cyclophilin A", HEPATOLOGY, (2009), vol. 50, no. 5, pages 1638 - 1645, XP009143580

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.23281
 [A]  - SOE ET AL., "Cyclophilin A: A mediator of cardiovascular pathology", JOURNAL OF THE KOREAN SOCIETY OF HYPERTENSION, (2011), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 133 - 147, XP055242927

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5646/jksh.2011.17.4.133
by applicant   - MERRIFLELD, J. AMER CHEM SOC, (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2156
    - DEUTSCHER, M., Guide to Protein Purification Methods Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS. INC., (1990), vol. 182
    - ENGELS; UHLMANN, ANGEW CHEM INTED ENGL, (1988), vol. 37, pages 73 - 127
    - WOLFF ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1465 - 8
    - WOLFF ET AL., J CELL SCI, (1992), vol. 103, pages 1249 - 59
    - SCHAEFER-RIDDER M ET AL., SCIENCE, (1982), vol. 215, no. 4529, pages 166 - 168
    - HODGSON ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1996), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 339 - 342
    - HASHIDA, BR J CANCER., (2004), vol. 90, no. 6, pages 1252 - 1258
    - WISEMAN, GENE THER, (2003), vol. 10, no. 19, pages 1654 - 1662
    - KOPING-HOGGARD, GENE THER, (2001), vol. 8, no. 14, pages 1108 - 1121
    - ROSENBERG ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 56, pages 125 - 135
    - SHINE; DALGARNO, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1974), vol. 71, pages 1342 - 1346