Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897050

EP2897050 - SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.04.2017  [2017/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / MIWA, Akihiro
c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1
Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)Ettmayr, Andreas
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Ettmayr, Andreas
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13837979.709.09.2013
WO2013JP74241
Priority number, dateJP2012020279714.09.2012         Original published format: JP 2012202797
[2015/30]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014042122
Date:20.03.2014
Language:JA
[2014/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897050
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/16, G06F11/18, G10L19/00, H04L29/06, G06F3/16, G10L21/00, G10L21/0208, // G10L19/16
[2016/18]
Former International [2015/30]G06F11/16, G06F11/18, G10L19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
TitleGerman:SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND -PROGRAMM[2015/30]
English:SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM AND PROGRAM[2015/30]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL[2015/30]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2015Translation filed 
10.03.2015National basic fee paid 
10.03.2015Search fee paid 
10.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
03.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/17]
09.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006224763  (ALTUNBASAK YUCEL [US] ET AL) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0015] - [0032] - [0038] - [0053] - [0055] - [0070]; figures 2,5,6 *;
 [I]US2010188967  (MICHAELIS PAUL ROLLER [US] ET AL) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0026]; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2008225850  (ORAN DAVID R [US] ET AL) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0016]; figures 1,2 *
International search[A]JP2003008621  (FUJITSU LTD.);
 [A]JPS61285549  (SPERRY CORP.);
 [A]JPH0536293  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [A]JP2009141395  (YAMAHA CORP.);
 [A]JP2010218013  (YAMAHA CORP.)
by applicantWO2010016589