EP2898203 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPONENT COOLING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUTSCHI, Steven Bruce 146 Applewood Lane Naugatuck, Connecticut 06770 / US | 02 /
THORNTON, Lane 155 Windermere Ave Unit 501 Ellington, Connecticut 06029 / US | [2015/46] |
Former [2015/31] | 01 /
GAUTSCHI, Steven Bruce 146 Applewood Lane Naugatuck, Connecticut 06770 / US | ||
02 /
THORNTON, Lane 69-409 Westwood Knoll Meriden, Connecticut 06450 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13838225.4 | 17.09.2013 | WO2013US60039 | Priority number, date | US201213621968 | 18.09.2012 Original published format: US201213621968 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014047022 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898203 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/12, F01D5/08, F01D5/18 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
F01D5/189 (EP,US);
F05D2240/126 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | F02C7/12, F01D5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | KÜHLSYSTEM FÜR GASTURBINENBAUTEILE | [2015/31] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPONENT COOLING CIRCUIT | [2015/31] | French: | CIRCUIT DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE COMPOSANT DE MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 23.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1380724 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,12-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-4; claims 1-7 * [Y] 9-11; | [XY]EP1136652 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-5; claim 1 * [Y] 9-11; | [XY]GB2054749 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-8,12-15 * column 1, line 114 - column 2, line 108; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 9-11; | [XY]EP1302628 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-8,12-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-4; claims 1-12 * [Y] 9-11; | [XY]EP1452689 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,12-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-7; claim 1 * [Y] 9-11 | International search | [X]US2004009066 (SOECHTING FRIEDRICH [US], et al); | [Y]US7497655 (LIANG GEORGE [US]); | [A]US4297077 (DURGIN GEORGE A, et al); | [A]US2007059172 (LEE CHING-PANG [US], et al); | [A]US2010166564 (BENJAMIN EDWARD D [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1380724 | EP1136652 | GB2054749 | EP1302628 | EP1452689 |