Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2898588

EP2898588 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / TZANIDIS, Ioannis
701 Legacy Drive Apt. 2022
Plano Collin County, Texas 75023 / US
02 / AZAD, Umar
2237 Maroel Drive
San Jose Santa Clara County, California 95130 / US
03 / RAJAGOPAL, Sridhar
8809 Vernon Court
Plano Collin County, Texas 75025 / US
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/31]Gover, Richard Paul
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13838281.723.09.2013
WO2013KR08485
Priority number, dateUS201261704378P21.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261704378 P
US20131402825416.09.2013         Original published format: US201314028254
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014046504
Date:27.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2898588
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014
[2015/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02J50/10, H02J50/40, // H02J50/80, H02J50/50
[2016/21]
Former International [2015/31]H02J17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN STROMÜBERTRAGUNG[2015/31]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION[2015/31]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT D'ÉLECTRICITÉ SANS FIL[2015/31]
Entry into regional phase21.04.2015National basic fee paid 
21.04.2015Search fee paid 
21.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
14.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/40]
19.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JP2012120288  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,9,13,15 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,14 [I] 2;
 [A]US2009271048  (WAKAMATSU MASATAKA [JP]) [A] 1-5,9,13-15 * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0184]; figure 7 *
International search[A]US2012169137  (LISI GIANPAOLO [US], et al);
 [A]WO2012073349  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]US2009289595  (CHEN CHIH-JUNG [TW], et al);
 [A]US2012202435  (KIM NAM YUN [KR], et al);
 [A]US2010277003  (VON NOVAK WILLIAM H [US], et al)