Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897660

EP2897660 - ELECTROSPUN MATERIAL COVERED MEDICAL APPLIANCES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
1600 West Merit Parkway
South Jordan, UT 84095 / US
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / HALL, John William
981 South Parkway Drive
North Salt Lake, Utah 84054 / US
02 / DOLMATCH, Bart
3812 Colgate Avenue
Dallas, Texas 75225 / US
03 / ELLER, Zeke
2109 Brugge Court
Plano, Texas 75025 / US
04 / KELLAR, Robert S.
708 North Fox Hill Road
Flagstaff, Arizona 86004 / US
05 / SIMMONS, Rachel Lynn
1128 South Oakridge Lane
Bountiful, Utah 84010 / US
06 / MOWER, Wayne L.
252 Lewis Park Cove
Bountiful, Utah 84010 / US
 [2015/38]
Former [2015/31]01 / HALL, John William
981 South Parkway Drive
North Salt Lake, Utah 84054 / US
02 / DOLMATCH, Bart
3812 Colgate Avenue
Dallas, Texas 75225 / US
03 / ELLER, Zeke
3227 McKinney Avenue
20-D
Dallas, Texas 75204 / US
04 / KELLAR, Robert S.
708 North Fox Hill Road
Flagstaff, Arizona 86004 / US
05 / SIMMONS, Rachel Lynn
1128 South Oakridge Lane
Bountiful, Utah 84010 / US
06 / MOWER, Wayne L.
252 Lewis Park Cove
Bountiful, Utah 84010 / US
Representative(s)Bradley, Adrian , et al
Cleveland LLP
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[2015/31]
Application number, filing date13838578.617.09.2013
WO2013US60172
Priority number, dateUS201261703037P19.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261703037 P
US20131382661814.03.2013         Original published format: US201313826618
US20131382779014.03.2013         Original published format: US201313827790
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014047065
Date:27.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897660
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014
[2015/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61L31/10, A61L31/14, A61L27/34, A61L27/14, A61F2/02
[2016/17]
Former International [2015/31]A61L27/34, A61L27/14, A61F2/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
TitleGerman:MIT ELEKTROGESPONNENEM MATERIAL BEDECKTE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2015/31]
English:ELECTROSPUN MATERIAL COVERED MEDICAL APPLIANCES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE[2015/31]
French:ACCESSOIRES MÉDICAUX REVÊTUS D'UN MATÉRIAU ÉLECTROFILÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2015/31]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2015National basic fee paid 
03.03.2015Search fee paid 
03.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
21.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2019
01.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO2013109528  (MERIT MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [XP] 1-8,10,12-15 * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0120] *;
 [A]US2004054397  (SMITH SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] *
International search[X]WO2012103501  (MERIT MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al);
 [Y]US2003114917  (HOLLOWAY KEN A [US], et al);
 [A]US2003211135  (GREENHALGH SKOTT E [US], et al);
 [A]US2010280590  (SUN JICHAO [US], et al);
 [A]US2004054397  (SMITH SCOTT [US], et al)
by applicantWO2012103501
    - NAKOPOULOU et al., Human Pathology, (19990400), vol. 30, no. 4