Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2884590

EP2884590 - ANISOTROPIC CONDUCTIVE FILM, CONNECTION METHOD, AND ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.10.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dexerials Corporation
Gate City Osaki
East Tower 8th Floor
11-2, Osaki 1-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0032 / JP
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Yasunobu
c/o Dexerials Corporation
1078 Kamiishikawa
Kanuma-shi Tochigi 322-8503 / JP
02 / UESAWA, Naoya
c/o Dexerials Corporation
1078 Kamiishikawa
Kanuma-shi Tochigi 322-8503 / JP
03 / AOKI, Kazuhisa
c/o Dexerials Corporation
1078 Kamiishikawa
Kanuma-shi Tochigi 322-8503 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]01 / YAMADA, Yasunobu
c/o Dexerials Corporation
1078
Kamiishikawa
Kanuma-shi Tochigi 322-8503 / JP
02 / UESAWA, Naoya
c/o Dexerials Corporation
1078
Kamiishikawa
Kanuma-shi Tochigi 322-8503 / JP
03 / AOKI, Kazuhisa
c/o Dexerials Corporation
1078
Kamiishikawa
Kanuma-shi Tochigi 322-8503 / JP
Representative(s)Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]Hill, Christopher Michael , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date13839712.010.09.2013
WO2013JP74317
Priority number, dateJP2012020397818.09.2012         Original published format: JP 2012203978
[2015/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014045931
Date:27.03.2014
Language:JA
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2884590
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01R11/01, C08J5/18, C09J9/02, C09J167/00, C08K3/08
[2019/45]
Former International [2015/25]H01R11/01, C08J5/18, C09J7/00, C09J9/02, C09J11/04, C09J121/00, C09J167/00, C09J201/00, H01B5/16, H01R43/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
TitleGerman:ANISOTROPE LEITFÄHIGE FOLIE, VERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG[2015/25]
English:ANISOTROPIC CONDUCTIVE FILM, CONNECTION METHOD, AND ASSEMBLY[2015/25]
French:FILM CONDUCTEUR ANISOTROPE, PROCÉDÉ DE CONNEXION, ET CORPS DE LIAISON[2015/25]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2015Translation filed 
11.03.2015National basic fee paid 
11.03.2015Search fee paid 
11.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
11.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
29.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2020Fee for grant paid
21.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]WO2009038190  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]JP2005190933  (TOYO BOSEKI)
by applicantJP2011132304
 WO9901519