Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2901302

EP2901302 - SESSION-SERVER AFFINITY FOR CLIENTS THAT LACK SESSION IDENTIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intuit Inc.
2700 Coast Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2015/32]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAPMAN, Raymond J.
c/o Intuit Inc.
2700 Coast Avenue
Mountain View California 94043 / US
02 / GEYER, Randall J.
5686 Gadwall Drive
Frisco Texas 75034 / US
03 / HUANG, Yexin
3713 Morning Dove Drive
Plano Texas 75025 / US
 [2015/32]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/27]
Former [2015/32]Davies, Simon Robert
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date13841043.605.09.2013
[2019/27]
WO2013US58245
Priority number, dateUS201261706677P27.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261706677 P
US20121365329916.10.2012         Original published format: US201213653299
[2015/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014051958
Date:03.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2901302
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014
[2015/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2901302
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.04.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16, H04L29/08
[2016/21]
Former International [2015/32]G06F15/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SITZUNGSSERVERAFFINITÄT FÜR CLIENTS OHNE SITZUNGSIDENTIFIKATOREN[2015/32]
English:SESSION-SERVER AFFINITY FOR CLIENTS THAT LACK SESSION IDENTIFIERS[2015/32]
French:AFFINITÉ SESSION-SERVEUR POUR CLIENTS NE DISPOSANT PAS D'IDENTIFIANT DE SESSION[2015/32]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2015National basic fee paid 
27.03.2015Search fee paid 
27.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
22.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2019Fee for grant paid
21.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
IS03.11.2019
PT04.11.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/11]AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
ES03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
HR03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
LV03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
RS03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
GR04.10.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/10]AT03.07.2019
CZ03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
SE03.07.2019
BG03.10.2019
NO03.10.2019
PT04.11.2019
Former [2020/09]CZ03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
NO03.10.2019
Former [2020/08]LT03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
NO03.10.2019
Former [2020/07]NL03.07.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003074432  (MAZZITELLI JOHN JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] *;
 [X]US2009177778  (TURK MLADEN [HR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0046] *;
 [X]US2003037108  (PEIFFER CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] *;
 [X]US2009193129  (AGARWAL PUNEET [IN], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0158] *
International search[Y]US6336135  (NIBLETT PETER DAVID [GB], et al);
 [Y]US2004117486  (BOURNE DONALD A [CA], et al);
 [A]US2010131659  (NARAYANA RAGHAV SOMANAHALLI [IN], et al);
 [A]US2011161403  (FU YAN [FI])
ExaminationJP2010282460
by applicantUS2003074432
 US2009017778
 US2003037108
 US2009193129