Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2904468

EP2904468 - USER TERMINAL APPARATUS, METHOD FOR INPUTTING TEXT IN USER TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL, SM
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/33]
Inventor(s)01 / SEO, Won-young
No. 301
349-4 Sin-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-390 / KR
 [2015/33]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/13]
Former [2015/33]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13843835.304.10.2013
[2015/33]
WO2013KR08911
Priority number, dateKR2012011092105.10.2012         Original published format: KR 20120110921
[2015/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014054922
Date:10.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2904468
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014
[2015/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2904468
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR10.04.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0481, G06F3/0489
[2016/20]
Former International [2015/33]G06F3/00, G06F3/14, G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BENUTZERENDGERÄT, VERFAHREN ZUR EINGABE VON TEXT IN EINEM BENUTZERENDGERÄT UND COMPUTERLESBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2015/33]
English:USER TERMINAL APPARATUS, METHOD FOR INPUTTING TEXT IN USER TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM[2015/33]
French:DISPOSITIF FORMANT TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR, PROCÉDÉ POUR SAISIR DU TEXTE DANS UN DISPOSITIF FORMANT TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR UN ORDINATEUR[2015/33]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2015National basic fee paid 
13.03.2015Search fee paid 
13.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
25.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2019Fee for grant paid
14.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL27.03.2019
CZ27.03.2019
EE27.03.2019
ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
PL27.03.2019
RO27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
SK27.03.2019
SM27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/49]AL27.03.2019
CZ27.03.2019
EE27.03.2019
ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RO27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
SK27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2011078636  (JEON MAN WOO [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-4,11-13,15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 4-8,15,16 * [Y] 5 [I] 6-10,14;
 [XI]US2008115072  (LU FANG [US]) [X] 1-4,11-13,15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 4,5 * [I] 6-10,14;
 [Y]EP2506134  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 2-5 *
International search[Y]KR20060062199  (VK CORPORATION);
 [Y]KR20070016675  (SEO, DONG CHUL);
 [Y]KR20070117339  (JANG, TAI SUN);
 [Y]US2009182901  (CALLAGHAN, DAVID ET AL.);
 [A]US2009327948  (PENTTINEN, MERJA TUULIKKI ET AL.)
ExaminationUS2004036679
by applicantUS2011078636
 US2008115072
 EP2506134