Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2905815

EP2905815 - SEALING FILM FOR SOLAR CELLS AND SOLAR CELL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.12.2017  [2017/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/33]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KATAOKA Hisataka
c/o Bridgestone Corporation Yokohama Kojo
1 Kashio-cho
Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8510 / JP
 [2015/33]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/33]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date13844398.103.10.2013
[2015/33]
WO2013JP76910
Priority number, dateJP2012022095203.10.2012         Original published format: JP 2012220952
JP2012022095103.10.2012         Original published format: JP 2012220951
JP2013016007701.08.2013         Original published format: JP 2013160077
JP2013016007501.08.2013         Original published format: JP 2013160075
[2015/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014054720
Date:10.04.2014
Language:JA
[2014/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2905815
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.04.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/042, C08K5/07, C08K5/5397, C08L23/08, H01L31/052
[2015/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
TitleGerman:VERSIEGELUNGSFILM FÜR SOLARZELLEN UND SOLARZELLE DAMIT[2015/33]
English:SEALING FILM FOR SOLAR CELLS AND SOLAR CELL USING SAME[2015/33]
French:FILM DE SCELLAGE POUR CELLULES SOLAIRES ET CELLULE SOLAIRE L'UTILISANT[2015/33]
Entry into regional phase01.05.2015Translation filed 
01.05.2015National basic fee paid 
01.05.2015Search fee paid 
01.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
01.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
25.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/52]
10.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/52]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2485271  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0035] - [0039]; examples 1-3,5; claim 3 *;
 [A]  - FUKUDA T ET AL, "Wavelength conversion film with glass coated Eu chelate for enhanced silicon-photovoltaic cell performance", OPTICAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 32, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.OPTMAT.2009.05.016, ISSN 0925-3467, (20091101), pages 22 - 25, (20090627), XP026698707 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.optmat.2009.05.016
International search[X]JP2006269373  (OSAKA UNIVERSITY, DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [Y]JP2012041465  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2010039161  (SEIKO EPSON CORP.);
 [Y]JP2006251589  (NITTO DENKO CORP.);
 [Y]JPH07202243  (BRIDGESTONE CORP.);
 [Y]WO2011040391  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2003243682
 JP2006303033
 JP2011210891