Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786206

EP2786206 - GUIDED PHOTOGRAPHY AND VIDEO ON A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
eBay, Inc.
2025 Hamilton Avenue
San Jose, CA 95125 / US
[2019/13]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
eBay Inc.
2145 Hamilton Avenue
San Jose, CA 95125 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GLASGOW, Dane
956 Manor way
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]01 / GLASGOW, Dane
956 Manor way
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
Representative(s)Schwegman Lundberg Woessner Limited
Hillington Park Innovation Centre
1 Ainslie Road
Glasgow G52 4RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date13846072.011.10.2013
WO2013US64594
Priority number, dateUS20121365037212.10.2012         Original published format: US201213650372
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014059307
Date:17.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2786206
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G03B17/00, H04N5/232, G06Q30/06
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/41]G03B17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:FOTOGRAFIE UND VIDEO UNTER ANLEITUNG AUF EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG[2014/41]
English:GUIDED PHOTOGRAPHY AND VIDEO ON A MOBILE DEVICE[2014/41]
French:PHOTOGRAPHIE ET VIDÉO GUIDÉES, SUR UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Search fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
03.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009106127  (PURDY TRAVIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2005007468  (STAVELY DONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6,10-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0028] , [0034] , [0041] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]US2011145713  (WILLIAMS BRIAN F [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,10-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]US2010114736  (LEWIS ALAN [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,10-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0032] * * figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]US2010217684  (MELCHER RYAN [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,10-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0066] - [0072] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]US2012259738  (PILLAI SAJEEV [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0032] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]US2004189829  (FUKUDA MITSUAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0020] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]US2009207279  (OCHI ATSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0045] * * figures 1-3,13,15-19 *;
 [Y]US2007182823  (MARUYAMA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0048] - [0053] * * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]WO2009006949  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,10-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 25 - page 6, line 14 * * figures 1-6C *;
 [A]WO2009053863  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [A] 9 * abstract *
International search[X]US2011004841  (GILDRED TYLER [US], et al);
 [Y]US2012179609  (AGARWAL ZHONGMIN [US], et al);
 [Y]US2009158220  (ZALEWSKI GARY [US], et al);
 [A]US2007061856  (SEKI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2011063325  (SAUNDERS CHRISTOPHER O'BYRNE [CA])