Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2909098

EP2909098 - FLEXIBLE LID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Å&R Carton Lund AB
Box 177
221 00 Lund / SE
[2015/35]
Inventor(s)01 / DAHLSTRÖM, Tommy
Jordlöparevägen 7
S-246 52 Löddeköpinge / SE
 [2015/35]
Representative(s)Romare, Laila Anette , et al
Valea AB
Lilla Bommen 3A
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2015/35]Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date13847194.110.10.2013
[2015/35]
WO2013SE51193
Priority number, dateSE2012005119019.10.2012         Original published format: SE 1251190
[2015/35]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014062119
Date:24.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2909098
Date:26.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014
[2015/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2909098
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE24.04.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:B65D53/04, B29C65/02, B32B37/30, B65D43/02, B32B37/16, B65D3/12, B65D77/20, B29L9/00, B32B7/04, B32B15/08, B32B15/20
[2016/22]
Former International [2015/35]B65D53/04, B29C65/02, B32B37/30, B65D43/02, B32B37/16, B65D3/12, B65D77/20, B29L9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLER DECKEL[2015/35]
English:FLEXIBLE LID[2015/35]
French:COUVERCLE SOUPLE[2015/35]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2015National basic fee paid 
19.05.2015Search fee paid 
19.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/35]
22.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2017Fee for grant paid
08.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2017
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.04.2018   
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [2018/21]
23.05.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.10.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.10.2013
AT19.07.2017
CY19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MK19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE10.10.2017
LU10.10.2017
MT10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU10.10.2013
AT19.07.2017
CY19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE10.10.2017
LU10.10.2017
MT10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2019/31]HU10.10.2013
AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE10.10.2017
LU10.10.2017
MT10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE10.10.2017
LU10.10.2017
MT10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU10.10.2017
MT10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/36]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU10.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/26]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1066497  (EKCO CONTAINERS) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 * * page 2, column 2, line 74 - line 100 * * page 2, column 2, lines 79-83 * * page 2, column 2, line 121 - line 127 *;
 [A]EP1559658  (TEICH AG [AT]) [A] 1-7 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0012] *;
 [A]WO0144073  (GEN MILLS INC [US]; ARCHIBALD WILLIAM E [US]; DEVRIES JONATHAN W [US];) [A] 1-7 * figure 4 * * claim 20 *
International search[A]US2007007229  (YOUSIF PAUL E);
 [A]DE1747781U  (PELIKAN WERKE WAGNER GUENTHER);
 [A]US4968624  (BACEHOWSKI DAVID ET AL)
OppositionUS2007007229
 DE1747781U
 US4968624
 GB1066497
 EP1559658
 WO0144073
 WO2005075314
    - Anonymous, "Cekacan, the ultimate paperboard can", Cekacan by A&R
    - Anonymous, "Presentation of Cekacan System 600", A&R, (19911200), pages 1 - 5, XP055487101
    - Filled and sealed Cow and Gate container containing infant nutrition, having a packaging date of 7.6.2011 and a 'best before'-date of 5.12.2012 , as evidenced by photographs 05a and 05b
    - Nutrilon Package, (20111003) * as evidence by photographs 08a - 08c. *