Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2913256

EP2913256 - VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP
[2015/36]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKANO Kazuhisa
c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP
02 / YAMASAKI Shigeto
c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP
 [2015/36]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2015/36]
Application number, filing date13849340.824.10.2013
[2015/36]
WO2013JP78876
Priority number, dateJP2012023560525.10.2012         Original published format: JP 2012235605
[2015/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014065385
Date:01.05.2014
Language:JA
[2014/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2913256
Date:02.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2913256
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:B62K5/10, B62K5/027
[2018/27]
Former International [2015/43]B62K5/05, B62K5/08, B62K21/00
Former International [2015/36]B62K5/05, B62K5/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUG[2015/36]
English:VEHICLE[2015/36]
French:VÉHICULE[2015/36]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2015Translation filed 
26.05.2015National basic fee paid 
26.05.2015Search fee paid 
26.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/36]
08.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2018Fee for grant paid
27.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2015
Opposition(s)04.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SI03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
IE24.10.2018
LU24.10.2018
MT24.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
CH31.10.2018
LI31.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
[2020/08]
Former [2019/50]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SI03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
IE24.10.2018
LU24.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
CH31.10.2018
LI31.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/48]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
IE24.10.2018
LU24.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
CH31.10.2018
LI31.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/40]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
LU24.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
CH31.10.2018
LI31.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/38]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
LU24.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
LU24.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
LU24.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/30]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
LU24.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/22]CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL03.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010194068  (HENDERSON LADDIE GENE [US]) [X] 1-3,7 * paragraph [0047]; figures 1,2,9,10 * [I] 11;
 [X]EP2368729  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4 * figures 5,8,9 *;
 [XY]EP1666346  (PIAGGIO & C SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [Y] 5,6,10;
 [Y]JPS59153674  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 5,6,10 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]CN202414056U  (JINJUN YU) [X] 1 * figures 3,4 *;
 [I]US4740004  (MCMULLEN WAYNE W [US]) [I] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JP2005172096  (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [A] 1,8,9 * figures 1,6 *;
 [A]WO2004018241  (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * figures 1,2; claim 20 *;
 [A]US2010314852  (CHIN HSU SHENG [CN] ET AL) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0054] , [0062]; figures 8,11 *
International search[A]JP2010228551  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010184508  (HIROSHI MORISE);
 [A]JP2011524836  (GIBBS TECHNOLOGIES LTD.);
 [A]JP2002337779  (AVANTEC CORP.)
ExaminationEP1561612
 CN201670311U
 US2011233885
by applicantJP2005313876
 DE102010052716
 USD547242S
 JP2000329168
 JP2010167999
 JP2013510053